Utah District Court
Judge:David Barlow
Referred: Jared C Bennett
Case #: 2:25-cv-00027
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 2:03 AM MST
Defendant
Michael Hill
Represented By
Jordan C. Lee
Polsinelli LLP
contact info
Jose A. Abarca
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Defendant
Mistras Group, Inc.
Represented By
Jordan C. Lee
Polsinelli LLP
contact info
Jose A. Abarca
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Acuren Inspection, Inc.
Represented By
Yasser A. Madriz
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Tanner J. Bean
Fabian Vancott
contact info
Sarah C. Vaughn
Fabian Vancott
contact info
Sarah M. Holub
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Meghaan C. Madriz
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, February 03, 2025
46 46 notice Notice From the Court Mon 02/03 10:09 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT. On January 31, 2025, Plaintiff filed its45 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the dismissal without prejudice is self-effectuating. The case has been dismissed without prejudice per the terms of the stipulated dismissal. No order will follow. (srk)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 02/03 4:02 PM
Civil Case Terminated as Per Notice from the Court no 46. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to case. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
45 45 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/31 7:23 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 by Acuren Inspection, Inc. (Madriz, Meghaan )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
44 44 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Thu 01/30 12:03 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 01/30/2025. (kpf)
Related: [-]
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/30 11:58 AM
ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until February 24, 2025 to respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Answer deadline updated for Michael Hill answer due 2/24/2025; Mistras Group, Inc. answer due 2/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 01/30/2025. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
42 42 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/29 4:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Michael Hill, Mistras Group, Inc.. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
41 41 notice Notice Vacating Hearing Thu 01/23 10:27 AM
NOTICE VACATING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING set for 1/27/2025 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David Barlow. (tcs)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Order on Motion for TRO Thu 01/23 10:26 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER terminating as moot 8 Motion for TRO per ECF No. 39. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/23/2025. No attached document. (tcs)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/23 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Acuren Inspection, Inc. re8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support (Madriz, Meghaan )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Withdrawal for Temporary Restraining Order
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
38 38 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Wed 01/22 3:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Mistras Group, Inc. identifying Mistras Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Wed 01/22 2:18 PM
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 01/22/2025. (kpf)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Order Wed 01/22 12:02 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER. The court has received and reviewed Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. ECF No. 30. Plaintiff is ordered to file a Reply by tomorrow, January 23, 2025, at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/22/2025. (srk)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Holub on behalf of Acuren Inspection, Inc. (Holub, Sarah)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yasser A. Madriz on behalf of Acuren Inspection, Inc. (Madriz, Yasser)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghaan C. Madriz on behalf of Acuren Inspection, Inc. (Madriz, Meghaan )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
32 32 misc Sealed Document (Atty) Tue 01/21 7:27 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** re30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Defendants Michael Hill, Mistras Group, Inc. NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties. . (Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Seal Document Tue 01/21 7:24 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Seal Document30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Defendants Michael Hill, Mistras Group, Inc.. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
30 30 26 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/21 7:19 PM
Redacted MEMORANDUM in Opposition re8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Michael Hill, Mistras Group, Inc..(Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Randy Stewart,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - PBF Bids,
Att: 4 9 pgs Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael Hill,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - November Text Messages,
Att: 6 Exhibit B - Text Messages,
Att: 7 Exhibit C - Email Dated 11/25/2024,
Att: 8 Exhibit D - Email Dated 11/22/2024,
Att: 9 Exhibit E - Email Dated 12/11/2024,
Att: 10 Exhibit F - December Text Messages,
Att: 11 Exhibit G - Offer Letter
Friday, January 17, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Fri 01/17 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc., Defendants Michael Hill, Mistras Group, Inc. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 11:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan C. Lee on behalf of Michael Hill, Mistras Group, Inc. (Lee, Jordan)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 11:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Abarca on behalf of Michael Hill, Mistras Group, Inc. (Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/16 2:40 PM
ORDER granting 25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Yasser A. Madriz for Acuren Inspection, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 01/16/2025. (kpf)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Thu 01/16 1:03 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Yasser Madriz , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5301577, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc..(Bean, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice - Yasser Madriz,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Yasser Madriz
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/15 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with Docket Text Order (ECF 21) by Acuren Inspection, Inc. re 21 Order,,, (Bean, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - 2025-01-14 Summons on Return - Hill,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 2025-01-14 Summons on Return - Mistras,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit 3 - Email to Mr. Hill,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Email to Mistras Counsel,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Relayed message to Hill,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Relayed message to Mistras
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Wed 01/15 11:56 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. It is ordered that Exhibits 3 and 4 to Plaintiffs Complaint shall remain under seal for the duration of this proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 01/15/2025. (kpf)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 01/15 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support : Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. (tcs)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Wed 01/15 10:32 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER. The court has received notice that Plaintiff has served Defendants the Complaint in this matter (ECF Nos. 17-18). The notices do not specifically indicate that the 8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order was also served on Defendants. The court will set a hearing on the Motion for 10:00 a.m. on January 27, 2025. Defendants' response shall be due on January 21, 2025. Because Defendants have not entered an appearance on the docket, the court orders Plaintiff to provide Defendants with a copy of 8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and its attachments, notify Defendants of the briefing schedule and hearing date set forth herein, and to file a certification on the docket no later than 12:00 noon on 1/16/2025 certifying that Plaintiffs have complied with this order. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/15/2025. (tcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 misc Sealed Document (Atty) Tue 01/14 4:13 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** re1 Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc. NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties. .(Bean, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 3 (UNREDACTED),
Att: 2 Exhibit 4 (UNREDACTED)
19 19 motion Leave to File Sealed Document Tue 01/14 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re1 Complaint,, Exhibits 3 and 4 filed by Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc.. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Bean, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Under Seal
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/14 4:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Acuren Inspection, Inc.. Summons as to Mistras Group, Inc.. (Bean, Tanner)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/14 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Acuren Inspection, Inc.. Summons as to Michael Hill. (Bean, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 3:56 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sarah M. Holub for Acuren Inspection, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 01/13/2025. (kpf)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 3:52 PM
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Meghaan Madriz for Acuren Inspection, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 01/13/2025. (kpf)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 01/13 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re9 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re Complaint. Counsel has not followed the appropriate filing procedure under DUCivR 5-3(b). The Motion for leave to file under seal must be filed contemporaneously with the proposed sealed exhibits. The motion and proposed sealed exhibits must be filed as separate docket entries and both linked to the redacted exhibits attached to the complaint (ECF No. 1-3, ECF No. 1-4). The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. (kpf)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/13 12:05 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/13/2025. (srk)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Mon 01/13 11:34 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER. The court is in receipt of Plaintiff's 8 motion for a TRO. The motion seeks ex parte consideration but does not meet the ex parte standard. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendants and then file on the docket notice that service has been effectuated. The court will then set a hearing on the motion for a TRO. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/13/2025. (tcs)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Mon 01/13 9:15 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Holub , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5296086, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc..(Bean, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice - Sarah Holub,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission
10 10 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Mon 01/13 9:01 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meghaan Madriz , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5296062, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc..(Bean, Tanner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice - Meghaan Madriz,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission
Friday, January 10, 2025
9 9 motion Leave to File Sealed Document Fri 01/10 4:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re1 Complaint,, Exhibits 3 and 4 filed by Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc..(Vaughn, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3 - Redacted,
Att: 3 Exhibit 4 - Redacted
8 8 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 01/10 4:00 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc..(Vaughn, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 01/10 3:50 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Mistras Group, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec) (kec)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/10/2025) Supplement Updated Summons
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 01/10 3:50 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Hill. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Fri 01/10 3:37 PM
Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) re1 Complaint,, Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance, filed by Acuren Inspection, Inc.. (Vaughn, Sarah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 01/10 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Acuren Inspection, Inc.. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 1/31/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice PHV Requirements Fri 01/10 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice emailed to attorney Yasser A. Madriz, Meghaan C. Madriz and Sarah Holub for Acuren Inspection, Inc. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 01/10 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. (kec)
Related: [-]
1 1 47 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 01/10 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to be filed separately) against Michael Hill, Mistras Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5295415) filed by Acuren Inspections, Inc.. (Vaughn, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1 - Verification of Trey Spencer,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Verification of Erik Barlow,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Growth by Design (redacted),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Weekly Report (redacted),
Att: 5 8 pgs Exhibit 5 - Restricted Activities Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - MH Resignation Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Restrictive Covenants
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/10 3:08 PM
Judge David Barlow added. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00027-DBB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]