Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:25-cv-00020
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 1:39 AM PST
Defendant
Blockchain Alliance, LLC
6933 E. Fanfol Dr.
Paradise Valley, AZ 85253
Defendant
Blockchain Funding, Inc.
1020 Wendy Lane
Cheyenne, WY 82009
Defendant
Joshua Denne
5735 E. Voltaire Ave.
Scottsdale, AZ 85254
Defendant
Lynne Martin
17671 San Roque Ln.
Huntington Beach, CA 92647
Defendant
Masternode Partners, LLC
30 N. Gould St. Ste. R
Sheridan, WY 82801
Defendant
Nima Momayez
187 E. Warm Springs Dr. Suite B206
Las Vegas, NV 89119
Defendant
Niya Holdings, LLC
187 E. Warm Springs Dr. Suite B206
Las Vega, NV 89119
Defendant
Brian Quinn
631 Irvine Ave.
Newport Beach, CA 92663
Defendant
Jeremy Roma
Plaintiff
Brian Shuster
508 Royalton Drive
Las Vegas, NV 89144
Represented By
Sherrie M. Flynn
Coleman & Horowitt LLP
contact info
James W. Puzey
Kearney, Puzey & Damonte, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Utherverse, Inc.
Represented By
Sherrie M. Flynn
Coleman & Horowitt LLP
contact info
James W. Puzey
Kearney, Puzey & Damonte, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
48 48 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 04/24 2:25 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint,, , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Joshua Denne, Blockchain Alliance, LLC, Brian Quinn, Nima Momayez, Nima Momayez, Niya Holdings, LLC by All Defendants. filed by All Defendants.(Fetaz, Maximilien)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
47 47 5 pgs order Order Thu 04/17 12:34 PM
ORDER on46 Stipulation : Plaintiffs have up to and including April 30, 2025, within which to file their response to the Countercomplaint served on February 28, 2025 (ECF No.30 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/16/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
46 46 motion Stipulation Tue 04/15 12:09 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCOMPLAINT re36 Order on Stipulation,30 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Flynn, Sherrie) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
45 45 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 04/11 9:17 AM
ORDER granting44 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/10/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
44 44 motion Stipulation Thu 04/10 10:11 AM
STIPULATION and Order to Set Aside Default [ECF 37] of Jeremy Roma re37 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendants Nima Momayez, Jeremy Roma, Brian Quinn, Niya Holdings, LLC, Blockchain Funding, Inc., Blockchain Alliance, LLC, Joshua Denne, Masternode Partners, LLC, Lynne Martin. (Fetaz, Maximilien) (other) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
43 43 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Mon 04/07 7:11 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
42 42 minord Minute Order Fri 04/04 11:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/4/2025. The court has approved the parties' Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (ECF No. 41 ), and it does not appear that an initial case management conference is necessary. If the parties disagree, they may file a stipulation requesting a case management conference. In the event a discovery dispute arises, the parties shall follow the informal discovery dispute procedure outlined in the Court's Civil Standing Order (ECF No. 21 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Conference scheduled for Tuesday, April 8, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
41 41 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 04/04 11:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting 40 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/26/2026. Motions due by 2/25/2026. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/27/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/4/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
40 40 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 04/03 2:04 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Counter Defendants Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc., Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Case Management Report Thu 04/03 2:01 PM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Counter Defendants Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc., Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
38 38 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 04/01 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Maximilien Fetaz on behalf of Defendant Jeremy Roma. (Fetaz, Maximilien)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 04/01 7:24 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeremy Roma re32 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
36 36 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/31 12:32 PM
ORDER granting 35 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs to Respond to Countercomplaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/31/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
35 35 motion Stipulation Fri 03/28 3:17 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to Countercomplaint re30 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, by Counter Defendants Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc., Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Flynn, Sherrie) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
34 34 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 03/28 12:23 PM
ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely for the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/28/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
33 33 motion Motion Leave to Appear Telephonically Thu 03/27 5:46 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear telephonically or via videoconferencing platform, Attorney Sherrie M. Flynn, re31 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,, by Counter Defendants Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc., Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. Responses due by 4/10/2025.(Flynn, Sherrie) Related [+]
Related: [-] ferral
Att: 1 Declaration of Sherrie M Flynn
Friday, March 21, 2025
32 32 motion Motion Entry of Clerks Default Fri 03/21 2:04 PM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Jeremy Roma by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. Responses due by 4/4/2025.(Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sherrie M Flynn,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
31 31 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Tue 03/04 10:32 AM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - An in-person case management conference is set before this Court on TUESDAY, APRIL 8, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report electronically on CM/ECF by 4:00 p.m. on THURSDAY, APRIL 3, 2025. In advance of the mandatory case management conference, the parties shall file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than THURSDAY, APRIL 3, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/4/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 02/28 4:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/10/2025., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/14/2025.), COUNTERCLAIM against Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc., Utherverse Digital Inc., Peter Gantner, Nexus Venture LLC, Ari Good, Gary Shuster by Blockchain Alliance, LLC, Brian Quinn, Joshua Denne, Lynne Martin, Masternode Partners, LLC, Niya Holdings, LLC, Nima Momayez, Blockchain Funding, Inc.. filed by Blockchain Alliance, LLC, Brian Quinn, Joshua Denne, Lynne Martin, Masternode Partners, LLC, Niya Holdings, LLC, Nima Momayez, Blockchain Funding, Inc..(Fetaz, Maximilien)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/28 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc. re1 Complaint,,. Lynne Martin served on 1/24/2025. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/28 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc. re1 Complaint,,. Jeremy Roma served on 1/25/2025. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/28 2:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc. re1 Complaint,,. Brian Quinn served on 1/15/2025. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/28 2:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc. re1 Complaint,,. Blockchain Funding, Inc. served on 1/24/2025. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/28 2:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc. re1 Complaint,,. Blockchain Alliance, LLC served on 1/24/2025. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/28 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc. re1 Complaint,,. Masternode Partners, LLC served on 1/30/2025. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/28 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc. re1 Complaint,,. Joshua Denne served on 2/6/2025; Nima Momayez served on 2/6/2025; Niya Holdings, LLC served on 2/6/2025. (Flynn, Sherrie)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 02/28 11:55 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.20 Stipulation for Extension of Time (first request). Parties stipulate and agree that Defendants shall have up to and including February 28, 2025, within which to file their response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 2/28/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Standing Order Fri 02/28 11:16 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
20 20 motion Stipulation Thu 02/27 4:26 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Nima Momayez, Brian Quinn, Niya Holdings, LLC, Blockchain Funding, Inc., Blockchain Alliance, LLC, Joshua Denne, Masternode Partners, LLC, Lynne Martin. (Fetaz, Maximilien) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
19 19 6 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 2:45 PM
ORDER approving16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sherrie M. Flynn for Utherverse, Inc. and Brian Shuster and approving Designation of Local Counsel James W. Puzey. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/27/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Mon 01/27 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re16 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Sherrie M. Flynn, by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Service of corrected image is attached.)(Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
17 17 notice Notice Attorney Action Required Mon 01/27 12:44 PM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to ECF No.16 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. A certificate of good standing from the state bar or the clerk of the highest admitting court of the state where the applicant is admitted to practice is not attached. See LR IA 11-2 (b)(3). Attorney Flynn is advised to attach a certificate of good standing and refile the petition using the Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category. Petitioner must link the corrected image to his original pro hac vice motion (ECF No.16 ). (no image attached) (KW)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 01/27 11:50 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sherrie M. Flynn and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James W. Puzey (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7936850) by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 order Standing Order Thu 01/16 10:58 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 01/16 10:29 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Utherverse, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Thu 01/16 7:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blockchain Alliance, LLC, Blockchain Funding, Inc., Joshua Denne, Lynne Martin, Masternode Partners, LLC, Nima Momayez, Niya Holdings, LLC, Jeremy Roma. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 service Proposed Summons to be issued Wed 01/15 3:04 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Jeremy Roma, an individual by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Proposed Summons to be issued Wed 01/15 3:02 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Nima Momayez, an individual by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Proposed Summons to be issued Wed 01/15 3:01 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Niya Holdings, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proposed Summons to be issued Wed 01/15 2:59 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Lynne Martin by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Proposed Summons to be issued Wed 01/15 2:57 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Masternode Partners, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Proposed Summons to be issued Wed 01/15 2:55 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Blockchain Alliance LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons to be issued Wed 01/15 2:53 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Blockchainfunding, Inc., a Delaware Corporation by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons to be issued Wed 01/15 2:49 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Joshua Denne, an individual by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Mon 01/13 8:30 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Sheri Flynn to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER[LINK:www.pacer.gov] to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/27/2025. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/13 8:04 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Quinn. (DRM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 01/13 8:02 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
2 2 service Proposed Summons to be issued Fri 01/10 5:01 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiffs Utherverse, Inc., Brian Shuster.(Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/10 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7921640) by Brian Shuster, Utherverse, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/20/2025. Proof of service due by 4/10/2025. (Puzey, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Complaint