Oregon District Court
Judge:Karin J Immergut
Case #: 3:25-cv-00055
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 1:41 AM PST
Defendant
NB The Village at Gresham, LLC
Plaintiff
Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By
Douglas R. Pahl
Perkins Coie, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 minute Rule 16 Conference Tue 04/29 2:22 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Deadlines are set as follows. Deadline to amend pleadings or join parties is 10/22/2025. The last date to file any fact discovery motion is 11/21/2025, and responses to such motions are due no later than fourteen (14) calendar days after the initiating motion is filed; no replies are permitted for discovery motions. Fact discovery is to be completed by 12/19/2025. Initial expert disclosures due 1/9/2026; rebuttal expert disclosures due 2/9/2026. The last date to file any expert discovery motion is 2/16/2026, and responses to such motions are due no later than fourteen (14) calendar days after the initiating motion is filed; no replies are permitted for discovery motions. Expert discovery is to be completed by 3/16/2026. Joint statement of agreed and disputed facts due 3/30/2026. Joint ADR Report is due no later than 4/13/2026. Dispositive motions, if any, are due on or before 4/13/2026. Pretrial Order and Verdict Form due 9/10/2026. Trial documents must be filed by Noon on 9/17/2026. Pretrial Conference is set for 10/8/2026 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13A. Jury trial (3 days) is set to commence 10/27/2026 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13A before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Parties shall review Case Management Order (attached) for further details. Douglas R. Pahl present as counsel for Plaintiff. Garrett S. Ledgerwood present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Karin J. Immergut presiding. (jy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
11 11 order 1 - Scheduling Fri 04/18 12:13 PM
Scheduling Order. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/29/2025 at 11:00AM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 oth_doc Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan Thu 04/17 4:49 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Pahl, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 oth_ans Answer Tue 04/15 3:11 PM
Answer to Answer to Complaint7 Answer to Defendant's Claim for Relief Related [+] Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Pahl, Douglas)
Related: [-] Answer to Complaint7 .
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/25 3:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by NB The Village at Gresham, LLC. (Ledgerwood, Garrett)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/25 3:24 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by NB The Village at Gresham, LLC. (Ledgerwood, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Tue 03/11 4:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION: Finding good cause, Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint, ECF5 , is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before March 25, 2025. Any future request for an extension must be made at least seven (7) days in advance of the relevant deadline. Ordered on 3/11/2025 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Tue 03/11 2:59 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,1 . Filed by NB The Village at Gresham, LLC. (Ledgerwood, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Summons Fri 02/14 2:28 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by NB The Village at Gresham, LLC waiver sent on 2/14/2025. Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Pahl, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/13 9:38 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to NB The Village at Gresham, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Mon 01/13 9:26 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/13/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/12/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 6/12/2025. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (gd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/10 2:46 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9707284 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association against NB THE VILLAGE AT GRESHAM, LLC. (Pahl, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons