Arkansas Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-50004
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 1:15 AM CST
Defendant
Lucky Bannavong (1)
Represented By
Stevan Earl Vowell
Taylor Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Briana Erin Robbins
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/11/2025 1:48 AM CST
Thursday, November 21, 2024
Arrest of Lucky Bannavong. (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Lucky Bannavong (1). (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
2 2 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Arrest Warrant Issued as to Lucky Bannavong. (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting Hearings as to Lucky Bannavong : Initial Appearance set for 11/22/2024 02:30 PM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Christy D. Comstock.. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on November 21, 2024. (cc via CM/ECF: U.S. Probation Office, U.S. Marshals Service) (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/21/2024 as to Lucky Bannavong. (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
Case unsealed as to Lucky Bannavong. (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
5 5 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. PRETRIAL REPORT in case as to Lucky Bannavong. (dn) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
6 6 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Christy D. Comstock: Initial Appearance as to Lucky Bannavong held on 11/22/2024; Attorney Stevan Vowell, CJA Appointment, for Lucky Bannavong present. Briana Robbins appeared for USA. Financial affidavit executed, Counsel appointed, USA ordered to provide all exculpatory evidence to Defendant pursuant to Brady v Maryland . Defendant waived the issues of probable cause and detention. Defendant remanded to custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. (Roxana Guerrero-Digital Recorder)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 210) (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Lucky Bannavong. THE ORIGINAL IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
8 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Stevan Vowell for Lucky Bannavong, CJA Representation Appointment. Defendant is entitled to counsel but cannot afford to hire an attorney, therefore, counsel is appointed to represent defendant in all further proceedings herein. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on November 22, 2024. (cc via CM/ECF: U.S. Probation Office, U.S. Marshals Service) (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Lucky Bannavong. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on November 22, 2024. (cc via CM/ECF: U.S. Probation Office, U.S. Marshals Service) (rg) [5:24-mj-05019-CDC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 INDICTMENT as to Lucky Bannavong (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (src)
Related: [-]
11 11 THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND COURT USERS. Citation Calendar as to Lucky Bannavong. (src)
Related: [-]
12 12 THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND THE FILER ONLY. Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA as to Lucky Bannavong. (src)
Related: [-]