Case Filed:Dec 13, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2025 2:16 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William Thomas Bozin
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Judith Hoekstra (1)
Terminated: 12/13/2024


Docket last updated: 01/12/2025 3:15 AM EST
Friday, December 13, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5) of Judith Hoekstra (mga)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Judith Hoekstra: Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 12/13/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom #1A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before US Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone. (mga)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Judith Hoekstra. (mga)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Judith Hoekstra (1). Entered by US Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/13/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry: INITIAL APPEARANCE in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Judith Hoekstra held before US Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone. Defendant advised of rights & charges. Defendant requested hearings in the prosecuting district. Defendant released. Defendant ordered to appear in charging district. Government attorney: William Bozin. Defendant attorney: Elizabeth Blackwood. Court Reporter: Digital Court Reporter. (mga)
Related: [-]
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Emailed to District of Columbia as to Judith Hoekstra (mga)
Related: [-]
Notice to District of Columbia of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Judith Hoekstra. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and documents. (Documents:2 Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings,1 Sealed Document,3 Bond,4 Order Setting Conditions of Release,5 Order Rule 5 Bond Release ) ( If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send a request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. ) (mga)
Related: [-]
1 1 DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA SEALED (Sealed - Attorney) : Complaint and Warrant (available to: USA)(mga)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant,
Att: 2 Sealing Order
2 2 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings by Judith Hoekstra (mga)
Related: [-]
3 3 Appearance Bond Entered Related [+] as to Judith Hoekstra in amount of $ 25,000 unsecured. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/13/24. (mga)
Related: [-] stricted
4 4 ORDER Related [+] Setting Conditions of Release as to Judith Hoekstra (1) 25,000 unsecured. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/13/24. (mga) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/18/2024) (brl).
Related: [-] stricted
5 5 ORDER holding defendant to answer and to appear in district of prosecution or district having Probation Jurisdiction as to Judith Hoekstra. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/13/24. (mga)
Related: [-]