North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:25-cv-00023
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
Benson I. Ejindu
Plaintiff
The State of North Carolina
Represented By
Matthew R. Petracca
Assistant Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Holly H Snow
Doj-Usao
contact info
Matthew R. Petracca
Assistant Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 05/05 10:52 AM
ORDER granting 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Benson I. Ejindu answer due 6/11/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/5/2025. (add)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time Sun 05/04 1:19 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint, by Benson I. Ejindu. (Terpening, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/03 4:10 PM
ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Benson I. Ejindu answer due 5/12/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/3/25. (mga)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/03 2:02 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint, by Benson I. Ejindu. (Terpening, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 03/06 10:11 AM
ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Benson I. Ejindu answer due 4/28/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/6/2025. (add)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 3 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 03/05 6:32 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint, by Benson I. Ejindu. (Terpening, William). Motions referred to David Keesler.
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/23 6:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America, The State of North Carolina. Benson I. Ejindu waiver sent on 1/13/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (Snow, Holly)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/13 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Petracca on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Petracca, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Mon 01/13 3:51 PM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (cjs)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 11, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 01/11 6:48 PM
COMPLAINT against BENSON I. EJINDU with Jury Demand, filed by United States of America, The State of North Carolina.(Snow, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 35 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit B
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/13 3:51 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cjs)
Related: [-]