Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00049
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:2721 Driver's Privacy Protection Act of 1994
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:03 AM CST
Defendant
Park Happy, LLC
Plaintiff
Nicholas Simpson
Represented By
David J. DiSabato
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info
Lisa R. Considine
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info
R. Scott Pietrowski
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/18 11:47 AM
ORDER: On March 17, 2025, Defendant Park Happy, LLC filed an unopposed motion to extend its deadline to respond to Plaintiff Nicholas Simpson's complaint and continue the initial case management conference set on April 15, 2025. (Doc. No.22 ). The motion is GRANTED. Park Happy, LLC shall respond to Simpson's complaint by June 16, 2025. The initial case management conference is set on June 25, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/18/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/18 10:07 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for C. Dewey Branstetter, Jr, Eric G. Osborne, John L. Farringer, IV admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/18 11:49 AM
Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 6/25/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/17 1:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Park Happy, LLC. (Branstetter, C.)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Mon 03/17 1:06 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Park Happy, LLC. (Branstetter, C.)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Farringer, IV on behalf of Park Happy, LLC (Farringer, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Osborne on behalf of Park Happy, LLC (Osborne, Eric)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by C. Dewey Branstetter, Jr on behalf of Park Happy, LLC (Branstetter, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 03/07 1:06 PM
ORDER: On March 6, 2025, Plaintiff Nicholas Simpson filed a motion to continue the initial case management conference set on March 11, 2025, because Defendant Park Happy, LLC, has not appeared in this matter. (Doc. No.16 ). The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to April 15, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/7/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/07 1:08 PM
Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 4/15/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 motion Continue Thu 03/06 1:59 PM
MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Nicholas Simpson. (Pietrowski, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/05 12:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, and Initial Case Management Conference served on T. Kelley on 2/25/2025, filed by Nicholas Simpson.(Pietrowski, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt
Monday, February 10, 2025
14 14 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/10 1:20 PM
ORDER granting9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Lisa R. Considine to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 02/10/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
13 13 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Wed 02/05 11:05 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:9 MOTION for attorney Lisa R. Considine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4248494). (Pietrowski, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/03 1:13 PM
ORDER granting10 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for David J. DiSabato to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 02/03/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 02/03 10:50 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 MOTION for attorney David J. DiSabato to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4248498). (Pietrowski, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Thu 01/30 9:01 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 ,10 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 12:45 PM
MOTION for attorney David J. DiSabato to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4248498) by Nicholas Simpson.(Pietrowski, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/29 12:42 PM
MOTION for attorney Lisa R. Considine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4248494) by Nicholas Simpson.(Considine, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 01/14 9:35 AM
Summons issued as to Park Happy, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (mg)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/14 9:30 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/14/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (sb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Mon 01/13 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Park Happy, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Pietrowski, R.)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 01/13 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/11/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 01/13 9:01 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 01/13 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 01/13 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 01/13 9:12 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Scott Pietrowski admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 01/13 9:13 AM
NY State Bar status verified as active for Lisa R. Considine not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Mon 01/13 9:14 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL David J. DiSabato, Lisa R. Considine: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/3/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 01/13 10:13 AM
NJ State Bar status verified as active for David J. DiSabato not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/13 9:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Park Happy, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4236423), filed by Nicholas Simpson.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet