Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-06604

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:25-ap-00012
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stephanie Witt
Represented By
Stephanie Witt
contact info
Defendant
James N Horst, D.O.
Represented By
James N Horst, D.O.
contact info
Defendant
Team Haalth Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth
265 Brookview Centre Way Suite 203
Koxville, TN 37919
Represented By
Team Haalth Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth
contact info
Plaintiff
MCR Health, Inc.
101 Riverfront Blvd Suite 710
Bradenton, FL 34205
Represented By
Steven M Berman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/18 9:38 AM
Adversary Case 8:25-ap-12 Closed. (Anel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Dismissal (voluntary) (BK) Thu 01/30 8:11 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by Steven M Berman on behalf of Plaintiff MCR Health, Inc.. (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
17 17 court Letter - Returned Funds Tue 01/28 10:43 AM
Returned Funds Letter Returned check #1113742 in the amount of $150.00 to Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP for payment of pro hac vice. Payment to be made to U.S. District Court, check has Bankruptcy Court as Payee. Payment received by the Court on January 27, 2025 . (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 25, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sun 01/26 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 01/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
Thursday, January 23, 2025
15 15 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/23 7:04 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Thor Y. Urness for Team Health Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth; Stephanie Witt; AmeriTeam Services, LLC and James N Horst, D.O.. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Anel)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice (AP) Tue 01/21 9:01 PM
Motion of Thor Urness to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Diana Evans on behalf of Interested Party AmeriTeam Services, LLC, Defendants James N Horst D.O., Team Health Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth, Stephanie Witt. (Evans, Diana)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 18, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sun 01/19 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 01/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Thursday, January 16, 2025
12 12 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Fri 01/17 1:12 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Steven Berman; Diana Evans; Roger Jones WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Preliminary Hearing on Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Preliminary Injunction Filed by Steven M Berman on behalf of Plaintiff MCR Health, Inc (Doc #2) - TRIAL 2/3/25 @ 9:30 AM; DISCOVERY SHORTEN 3 DAYS; RESPONSES 5 DAYS; ORDER BY COURT (CHAMBERS TO PREPARE) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 01/16 12:39 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Establishing Deadlines Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/3/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Anel)
Related: [-] 2
10 10 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/16 10:07 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Roger G Jones for Stephanie Witt; James N Horst, D.O. and Team Health Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice (AP) Thu 01/16 9:30 AM
Motion of Roger G. Jones to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Diana N Evans on behalf of Defendants James N Horst D.O., Team Health Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth, Stephanie Witt. (Lidia)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Response Thu 01/16 9:18 AM
Response to Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Preliminary Injunction Filed by Diana N Evans on behalf of Defendants James N Horst D.O., Team Health Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth, Stephanie Witt Related [+]. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 2
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 01/16 9:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Designation of Email Addresses Filed by Diana N Evans on behalf of Defendants James N Horst D.O., Team Health Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth, Stephanie Witt. (Lidia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
6 6 misc Summons Service Executed Wed 01/15 10:27 PM
Service Executed on Stephanie Witt; James N Horst, D.O., Team Health Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Preliminary Injunction and Notice of Hearing on Emergency Motion Filed by Steven M Berman on behalf of Plaintiff MCR Health, Inc. Related [+]. (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-] 2 ,4 ,5 ,1
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
5 5 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/14 4:57 PM
Summons issued on Stephanie Witt, James N Horst D.O., Team Haalth Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 02/13/2025. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 01/13 4:10 PM
Notice of Hybrid Hearing Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Preliminary Injunction Filed by Steven M Berman on behalf of Plaintiff MCR Health, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 1/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 misc Certificate of Necessity (AP) Mon 01/13 1:50 PM
Certificate of Necessity for Verified Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Preliminary Injunction Filed by Steven M Berman on behalf of Plaintiff MCR Health, Inc. Related [+]. (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 motion Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (AP) Mon 01/13 1:40 PM
Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Preliminary Injunction Filed by Steven M Berman on behalf of Plaintiff MCR Health, Inc.. (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 01/13 1:00 PM
Complaint by MCR Health, Inc. against Stephanie Witt, James N Horst D.O., Team Haalth Holdings, Inc., d/b/a TeamHealth. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [72 (Injunctive relief - other)],[91 (Declaratory judgment)]. (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
misc Emergency Matters Submission Notification Mon 01/13 2:11 PM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Preliminary Injunction to be heard on or before 01/16/2025 Filed by Steven M Berman on behalf of Plaintiff MCR Health, Inc. Related [+]. (Berman, Steven)
Related: [-] 3 ,2
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Mon 01/13 2:55 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 01/16/2025 10:00 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Preliminary Injunction Doc2 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Steven M Berman to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Adversary_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 2