BRPS Title of Texas LLC v. MNR Capital Group LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-36006
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-36006
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey P Norman |
Case #: | 4:25-ap-03003 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2025 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
MNR Capital Group LLC
7901 4th St. N. #7491
St. Petersburg, FL 33702 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRPS Title of Texas LLC
5353 W. Alabama St. Suite 310
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/16/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order Dismissing Adversary Case 4:25-ap-3003 Signed on 1/13/2025 (srh4) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Proposed Order RE: Dismissing Adversary (Filed By BRPS Title of Texas LLC ) (Tran Adams, Susan) |
|
Sunday, January 12, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/12/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, January 11, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Exhibit List (Filed By BRPS Title of Texas LLC ) (Tran Adams, Susan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service (Filed By BRPS Title of Texas LLC ) (Tran Adams, Susan) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Request for Issuance of Summons on MNR Capital Group LLC. (Filed By BRPS Title of Texas LLC ). (Tran Adams, Susan) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Setting Hearing Signed on 1/10/2025 Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 08:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (srh4) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Emergency Motion for Expedited Consideration of Application for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by BRPS Title of Texas LLC (Tran Adams, Susan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Order RE: Temporary Restraining Order (Filed By BRPS Title of Texas LLC ) (Tran Adams, Susan) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 25-03003 Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Complaint for Violation of the Automatic Stay, Turnover Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 542, and Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief by BRPS Title of Texas LLC against MNR Capital Group LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Tran Adams, Susan) |