Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Zachary C Bolitho
Case #: 3:25-cv-00017
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Case in other court:Okaloosa County, 2024-CA-003228 F
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 4:51 AM EST
Defendant
EPIC STAFFING GROUP INC
Represented By
TODD RICHARD DOBRY
Jackson Lewis Pc - Jacksonville Fl
contact info
MELANIE BAKER
Jackson Lewis Pc - Jacksonville Fl
contact info
Defendant
FEDERAL STAFFING RESOURCES LLC
Represented By
TODD RICHARD DOBRY
Jackson Lewis Pc - Jacksonville Fl
contact info
MELANIE BAKER
Jackson Lewis Pc - Jacksonville Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENDA GAINEY
Represented By
MARIE A MATTOX
Mattox Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
ADAM JAMES ELLIS
Mattox Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN
Mattox Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 13, 2025
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Staffing Resources, LLC n/k/a Epic Government, Epic Staffing Group, Inc. d/b/a Epic Government from First Judicial Circuit, Okaloosa County, case number 2024-CA-003228 F. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9235606.), filed by Federal Staffing Resources, LLC n/k/a Epic Government, Epic Staffing Group, Inc. d/b/a Epic Government. (DOBRY, TODD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet