Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Cov
Referred: Lindsay S Griffin
Case #: 8:25-cv-00090
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 4:58 AM EST
Defendant
Adena Lakeland, LLC
Represented By
Christopher R. Skambis
Dinsmore
contact info
Defendant
Global Contracting Group, LLC
Defendant
Mid-State Machine & Fabricating Corporation
Represented By
Jessica Serell Erenbaum
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mineral Development, LLC
Plaintiff
UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By
William Paul Wassweiler
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Conor H.M. Smith
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Kimberly A Carabotta
Ballard Spahr
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
46 46 4 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 11:47 PM
ORDER appointing Gregory P. Holder as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for April 2, 2026, at 9:00 a.m. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/6/2025. (MG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
45 45 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 05/05 9:12 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/2/2026 at 9:00 a.m. before Gregory Holder. (Smith, Conor)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
44 44 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/18 9:36 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Attorney Kimberly A. Carabotta's unopposed motion to withdraw as attorney for the plaintiff, Doc. 43 , is GRANTED. Attorney Kimberly A. Carabotta is relieved of further responsibility for this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin on 4/18/2025. (NGB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
43 43 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/17 11:30 AM
MOTION for Kimberly A. Carabotta to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of appearance Tue 04/15 7:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Nicole Perkins on behalf of UMB Bank, N.A. (Perkins, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
41 41 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 04/14 11:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Consent Motion for Stay of Entry of Scheduling Order. (Doc. # 37 ). The Court has entered its Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc.# 38 ), which aligns with what has been requested in this Motion. The Court finds that setting the trial term to November 2026 - nearly two years after this action was initiated - adequately addresses the parties' concerns. To the extent that the parties seek to stay discovery and/or schedule a hearing, such discovery matters fall within the purview of the magistrate judge. The parties shall accordingly coordinate any discovery-related matters with the chambers of Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin. The Court will not continue or extend any deadlines given the accommodations that already have been granted. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/14/2025. (MG)
Related: [-]
40 40 4 pgs order Order Mon 04/14 3:52 PM
ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/14/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Order Mon 04/14 3:51 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order Doc. 38 , no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/14/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 04/14 3:49 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Non-Jury Trial set for November 2026 Trial Term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/15/2026. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/14/2025. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
37 37 motion Stay Wed 04/09 10:00 AM
Consent MOTION to Stay Entry of Scheduling Order by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Smith, Conor)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
36 36 misc Case Management Report Mon 04/07 4:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Smith, Conor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
35 35 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 11:19 AM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Verified Complaint for Foreclosure, for Appointment of Receiver, and for other relief ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Global Contracting Group, LLC.(Valkenburg, Derrick) Modified text on 4/1/2025 (AM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
34 34 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 12:11 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Mineral Development, LLC.(Bowen, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
33 33 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 03/17 4:21 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Global Contracting Group, LLC. (Valkenburg, Derrick)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 03/17 2:37 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Mid-State Machine & Fabricating Corporation. (Erenbaum, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/14 2:37 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Mineral Development, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Doc. # 30 ). Mineral Development's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is now March 31, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/14/2025. (MG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 03/13 3:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Mineral Development, LLC. (Bowen, Chad)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 03/13 3:41 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Mineral Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MD1, LLC for Mineral Development, LLC. (Bowen, Chad) Modified on 3/14/2025 to edit docket text. (WLB)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of appearance Thu 03/13 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad S. Bowen on behalf of Mineral Development, LLC (Bowen, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
27 27 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 02/24 3:02 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jessica Erenbaum of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/24 12:09 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Mid-State Machine & Fabricating Corporation.(Erenbaum, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
25 25 19 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver Fri 02/14 1:47 PM
ORDER granting in part 22 Motion to Appoint Receiver.. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/14/2025. (RAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/12 2:43 PM
NOTICE by UMB Bank, N.A. re 23 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver regarding Unopposed Motion (Smith, Conor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 order Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver Tue 02/11 2:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER ruling deferred 22 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Counsel has indicated that this motion is time sensitive and that it is unopposed. But there is a caveat, in that opposing counsel reserves the right to object to the order. A proposed order had been sent to this Court so that order can be provided to opposing counsel. There are two options here: 1. if the motion is completely unopposed, the Court can proceed to rule on the matter or 2. if the motion is not completely unopposed, the Court will wait 14 days before ruling on the matter. Plaintiff is free to supplement its request with this information, but at this juncture, the Court will wait 14 days before ruling. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/11/2025. (Covington, Virginia)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Appoint Receiver Tue 02/11 12:39 PM
Time Sensitive MOTION to Appoint Receiver UNOPPOSED by UMB Bank, N.A..(Smith, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit A - Gendler Declaration,
Att: 2 Affidavit B - Becker Declaration
Monday, February 10, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/10 4:09 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Mid-State Machine & Fabrication Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Doc. # 20 ). Mid-State Machine & Fabrication Corporation's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is now February 24, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/10/2025. (MG)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 02/10 3:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Mid-State Machine & Fabricating Corporation. (Erenbaum, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 02/07 3:58 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Adena Lakeland, LLC. (Skambis, Christopher)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/07 3:43 PM
Defendant, Adena Lakeland, LLC.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer & Affirmative Defenses by Adena Lakeland, LLC.(Skambis, Christopher)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Fri 02/07 3:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by April 14, 2025, file a completed uniform Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/7/2025. (MG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
16 16 service Waiver of service executed Wed 02/05 6:09 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/05/2025 by UMB Bank, N.A. as to Global Contracting Group, LLC. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 service Proof of service Mon 02/03 9:03 PM
PROOF of service by UMB Bank, N.A. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Proof of service Mon 02/03 9:02 PM
PROOF of service by UMB Bank, N.A. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
13 13 order Order Fri 01/31 9:23 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff UMB Bank, Defendant Mineral Development, LLC, and two non-parties filed a Joint Stipulation for Order Appointing Receiver. (Doc. # 11 ). Plaintiff is suing not only Defendant Mineral Development, LLC, the borrower, but three defendants identified as "Junior Lienholders." (Doc. # 1 at 8). However, a review of the docket shows that a return of service has not been filed for the "Junior Lienholders." The Court does not find it appropriate to enter the order requested until all of the parties have been served, have responded to the complaint, and have had the opportunity to be heard on the requested relief. Plaintiff is free to request relief by filing a motion at the appropriate time, but no sooner than after a return of service is filed for each of the three "Junior Lienholders." Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/31/2025. (MG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 order Order Tue 01/28 3:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The parties filed a Joint Stipulation for Order Appointing Receiver and Request for Leave to File Proposed Order. (Doc. # 11 ). Per the parties' request (Id. at 22), the parties are directed to promptly email the proposed order as a Word document to the Court at chambers_flmd_covington@flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/28/2025. (MG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 01/16 12:29 PM
STIPULATION for Order Appointing Receiver and Request for Leave to File Proposed Order by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Wassweiler, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
10 10 service Summons issued Tue 01/14 4:16 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Adena Lakeland, LLC, Global Contracting Group, LLC, Mid-State Machine & Fabricating Corporation, Mineral Development, LLC. (MSN)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/14 10:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed motions for special admission. Docs. 4 and 5 . Attorneys William P. Wassweiler and Conor H.M. Smith must submit a "Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration" through PACER. As explained in the Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, failure to register for CM/ECF may result in the lawyer's termination from the docket, the lawyer's not receiving a copy of papers filed in the case, or the dismissal of the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin on 1/14/2025. (NGB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of service executed Mon 01/13 6:04 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/13/2025 by UMB Bank, National Association, as Trustee of the Polk County Industrial Development Revenue Bonds as to Mineral Development, LLC. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/13 4:40 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin. New case number: 8:25-cv-90-VMC-LSG. Motion(s) REFERRED:5 Unopposed MOTION for Conor H.M. Smith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22905167 for $150 ,4 Unopposed MOTION for William P Wassweiler to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22905096 for $150 . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin. (RPB)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 01/13 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kimberly A Carabotta on behalf of UMB Bank, National Association, as Trustee of the Polk County Industrial Development Revenue Bonds. Lead Counsel: William P. Wassweiler. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 3:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Conor H.M. Smith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22905167 for $150 by UMB Bank, National Association, as Trustee of the Polk County Industrial Development Revenue Bonds. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 3:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION for William P Wassweiler to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22905096 for $150 by UMB Bank, National Association, as Trustee of the Polk County Industrial Development Revenue Bonds. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 01/13 3:49 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by UMB Bank, National Association, as Trustee of the Polk County Industrial Development Revenue Bonds. Related case(s): Yes (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 01/13 3:47 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by UMB Bank, National Association, as Trustee of the Polk County Industrial Development Revenue Bonds identifying Corporate Parent UMB Financial for UMB Bank, National Association, as Trustee of the Polk County Industrial Development Revenue Bonds.. (Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/13 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22904892) filed by UMB Bank, National Association, as Trustee of the Polk County Industrial Development Revenue Bonds.(Carabotta, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Indenture,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B Loan Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Promissory Note,
Att: 5 Exhibit Leasehold Mortgage,
Att: 6 Exhibit Security Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit Assignment of Contracts,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ground Lease,
Att: 9 Exhibit Recovery Agreement,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons Global Summons,
Att: 11 Proposed Summons Mid-State Summons,
Att: 12 Proposed Summons Adena Summons,
Att: 13 Proposed Summons Mineral Summons