Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:J P Stadtmueller
Case #: 2:25-cv-00054
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 4:34 AM CST
Defendant
Irm Fareen Butt
Defendant
Lemniscata Capital LLC
Defendant
Carl Millender
Plaintiff
Donald R Bingham
Represented By
Johanna L Tracy
Carden & Tracy
contact info
Terrence S Carden, III
Carden & Tracy
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 order Judgment Fri 02/14 11:08 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/14/2025. Case DISMISSED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/14 11:01 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/14/2025 DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
order Text Only Order Mon 02/03 10:16 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 2/3/2025. Plaintiff1 filed this action on January 13, 2025, averring that the Court has jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332 due to complete diversity between the parties and the amount in controversy. On January 17, 2025, the Court2 ordered Plaintiff to amend his complaint to cure several issues with jurisdiction and venue therein. Plaintiff's3 amended complaint addressed only one of the deficiencies discussed by the Court. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that, on or before 2/10/2025, Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint, curing the remaining deficiencies. Specifically, Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint must properly plead the domicile of natural citizen parties, rather than their residence. See Sheneman v. Jones, 682 F. Appx 498, 499 (7th Cir. 2017) (citing Miss. Band of Choctaw Indians v. Holyfield, 490 U.S. 30, 48 (1989)). Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint shall also show cause as to why venue is proper in the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. (cc: all counsel) (CFZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/28 11:37 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Ronald Bingham.(Carden, Terrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, January 17, 2025
2 2 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/17 1:27 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/17/2025. By 1/31/2025, Plaintiff to FILE an amended complaint as directed regarding jurisdiction and venue deficiencies. Failure to timely or satisfactorily do so may result in dismissal or transfer of this action as appropriate. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
service Summons Issued Tue 01/14 8:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Irm Fareen Butt, Lemniscata Capital LLC, and Carl Millender. (mew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/13 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Ronald Bingham. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4859159)(Carden, Terrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 01/13 3:47 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (mew)
Related: [-]