Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:25-bk-40100
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Dismissed:Apr 15, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
The Benk Group LLC
1960 Tapadero Ln
Celina, TX 75009-0319
Represented By
Robert DeMarco, III
Robert Demarco
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:02 PM CDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
70 70 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/17 11:33 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 67 Agreed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case (RE: related document(s)59 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement and Setting Hearing Filed by US Trustee Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 01:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List Matrix) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). (dc)
69 69 motion Compensation and Expenses Thu 04/17 2:10 PM
Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Mark A WEISBART (SBRA V), Trustee Chapter 11, Fee: $2,692.50, Expenses: $155.63. Filed by Mark A WEISBART (SBRA V) (Weisbart, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
68 68 motion Vacate Dismissal Order (Reinstate Case) Thu 04/17 1:59 PM
Motion to Vacate Order Dismissing Case Filed by Mark A WEISBART (SBRA V) Related [+]. (Weisbart, Mark)
Related: [-] 67 Order on Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case by Trustee and Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
67 67 order Dismiss Chapter 11 Case by Trustee and Setting Hearing Tue 04/15 3:44 PM
Agreed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Related [+]. (dc)
Related: [-] 59 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement and Setting Hearing Filed by US Trustee Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 01:30 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List Matrix) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee
court POrder Note Tue 04/15 8:00 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
66 66 3 pgs misc Notice of Appearance Thu 04/10 3:08 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Jessica N. Alt) Filed by Balboa Capital Corporation (Alt, Jessica)
Related: [-]