New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Stewart D Aaron
Case #: 1:25-cv-00335
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 5:01 AM EST
Defendant
Novus Creatus LLC
Plaintiff
Mykayla Fagnani
On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates PLLC 150 E. 18th Street
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/18 12:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Novus Creatus LLC waiver sent on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. Document filed by Mykayla Fagnani..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 03/17 1:54 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Tuesday, May 13, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. The conference shall be conducted via telephone. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (855) 244-8681 and enter access code 2319 449 5090. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/17/2025) Initial Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (ar)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/14 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer E. Sherven on behalf of Novus Creatus LLC..(Sherven, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 01/16 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Novus Creatus LLC..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/15 4:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Novus Creatus LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Mykayla Fagnani..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/15 2:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/15 11:34 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/15/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/14 1:22 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Mykayla Fagnani..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/14 12:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael A. LaBollita. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 01/14 12:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 01/14 12:39 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 01/14 12:40 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 01/14 12:40 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/13 11:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Novus Creatus LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30452866)Document filed by Mykayla Fagnani..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]