Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:25-cv-20175
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Clerk of Courts (Traffic)
Defendant
Richard E. Gerstein Justice Building
Plaintiff
Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr.
16614 SW 99th Court
Miami, FL 33157


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 appeal Appeal Reinstated Tue 04/01 10:30 AM
Appeal Reinstated USCA Case Number 25-10451 D for8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 appeal USCA Order Tue 03/25 1:52 PM
ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA. This appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Samuel Lee Smith, Jr. failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements within the time fixed by the rules re8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr. USCA 25-10451 D (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
12 12 appeal Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA Wed 02/12 10:35 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr.. Date received by USCA: 02/11/2025. USCA Case Number: 25-10451 D. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/11 11:48 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying ECF No.9 , Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. In light of the Court's Order, ECF No.7 , finding Plaintiff's Complaint "clearly frivolous," Plaintiff's Motion to Appeal IFP the Order dismissing the Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jkk)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 02/11 8:20 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re8 Notice of Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
10 10 appeal Transcript Order Form - Court (PART I) Tue 02/11 8:19 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr re8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr.. No Transcript Requested. (jgo)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/11 8:18 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr. (jgo)
Related: [-]
8 8 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 02/11 8:17 AM
Notice of Appeal re7 Order Dismissing/Closing Case, by Samuel Lee Restricted Filer - Smith, Jr.. IFP Filed. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
7 7 5 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 02/07 9:52 AM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT: Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No.1 is DISMISSED as frivolous. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case and DENY all pending motions as MOOT. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, any scheduled hearings are CANCELED, all pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all deadlines are TERMINATED. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/6/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 02/05 1:33 PM
ORDER RESTRICTING FILING PRIVILEGES. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
5 5 misc Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) to receive Notices of Electronic Filing Mon 01/13 11:11 AM
Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Samuel Lee Smith, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: gymsam7@gmail.com (jas)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Volunteer Attorney Program Mon 01/13 11:10 AM
MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Samuel Lee Smith, Jr.. (jas)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/13 11:08 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Lee Smith, Jr.. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens Mon 01/13 11:04 AM
Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Clerk of Courts (Traffic), Richard E. Gerstein Justice Building. Filing fee $405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Samuel Lee Smith, Jr..(jas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)