Connecticut District Court
Judge:Kari A Dooley
Referred: Robert M Spector
Case #: 3:25-cv-00063
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 4:46 AM EST
Defendant
CVS Caremark Corporation
Represented By
Rebecca F. Briggs
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Defendant
GoodRx Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Brooks Crozier
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Defendant
GoodRx, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Brooks Crozier
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Defendant
Medimpact Healthcare Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Navitus Health Solutions LLC
Intervenor
Community Care Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By
David A. Slossberg
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Erica Oates Nolan
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Intervenor
Keaveny Drug, Inc.
Represented By
David A. Slossberg
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Erica Oates Nolan
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Intervenor
Minnesota Independent Pharmacists
Represented By
David A. Slossberg
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Erica Oates Nolan
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Intervenor
Old Baltimore Pike Apothecary, Inc.
Represented By
David A. Slossberg
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Erica Oates Nolan
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Intervenor
Smith's Pharmacy II, Inc.
Represented By
David A. Slossberg
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Erica Oates Nolan
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Intervenor
The Philadelphia Association of Retail Druggists
Represented By
David A. Slossberg
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Erica Oates Nolan
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Weston Pillbox Inc.
Represented By
David A. Slossberg
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
Erica Oates Nolan
Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC
contact info
David R Cheveire
Robert M. Cheverie & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Mon 04/21 10:23 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out Tue 04/22 12:10 PM
Case electronically transferred to the District of Rhode Island. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
28 28 4 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 10:15 AM
MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the District of Rhode Island. Signed by Karen K Caldwell, MDL Panel. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/19 10:20 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexandra Rose. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2025. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/19 10:17 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Lender. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2025. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
25 25 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/18 1:11 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Alexandra Rose to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-8069174) by GoodRx Holdings, Inc., GoodRx, Inc..(Crozier, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 New York Appellate Division Second Department Certificate of Good Standing
24 24 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/18 1:07 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) David Lender to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-8069149) by GoodRx Holdings, Inc., GoodRx, Inc..(Crozier, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Addendum to Affidavit of Visiting Attorney, David J. Lender,
Att: 2 New York Appellate Division First Department Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, February 13, 2025
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 02/13 5:01 PM
Disclosure Statement by CVS Caremark Corporation. (Briggs, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca F. Briggs on behalf of CVS Caremark Corporation (Briggs, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Thu 02/13 2:59 PM
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties'20 Joint Stipulation. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint within 45 days of the JPML's ruling on the Second Motion to Transfer. See ECF No. 20. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on February 13, 2025. (Spears, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation Wed 02/12 6:15 PM
Joint STIPULATION re1 Complaint, (Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) by GoodRx Holdings, Inc., GoodRx, Inc.. (Crozier, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 02/12 5:35 PM
Disclosure Statement by GoodRx, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GoodRx Holdings, Inc. for GoodRx, Inc.. (Crozier, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 02/12 5:31 PM
Disclosure Statement by GoodRx Holdings, Inc.. (Crozier, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Brooks Crozier on behalf of GoodRx Holdings, Inc., GoodRx, Inc. (Crozier, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion to Intervene Order on Motion to Withdraw Tue 01/28 6:03 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Withdraw; denying as moot9 Motion to Intervene. The Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Withdraw their9 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED , and accordingly, the9 Motion to Intervene is DENIED as moot . Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on January 28, 2025. (Spears, A.)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Withdraw Tue 01/28 12:37 PM
MOTION to Withdraw9 MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer by Proposed Intervenors by Keaveny Drug, Inc., Community Care Pharmacy, LLC, Minnesota Independent Pharmacists, The Philadelphia Association of Retail Druggists, Old Baltimore Pike Apothecary, Inc., Smith's Pharmacy II, Inc.. (Nolan, Erica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Slossberg on behalf of Keaveny Drug, Inc., Community Care Pharmacy, LLC, Minnesota Independent Pharmacists, The Philadelphia Association of Retail Druggists, Old Baltimore Pike Apothecary, Inc., Smith's Pharmacy II, Inc. REVISED Related [+] (Slossberg, David)
Related: [-] ECF No. 12
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Oates Nolan on behalf of Keaveny Drug, Inc., Community Care Pharmacy, LLC, Minnesota Independent Pharmacists, The Philadelphia Association of Retail Druggists, Old Baltimore Pike Apothecary, Inc., Smith's Pharmacy II, Inc. REVISED Related [+] (Nolan, Erica)
Related: [-] ECF No. 12
12 12 order Order Fri 01/17 12:01 PM
ORDER: On January 16, 2025, attorneys Erica Oates Nolan and David A. Slossberg filed appearances in this matter purportedly on behalf of Plaintiff, Weston Pillbox, Inc. See ECF Nos. 8, 11. However, the ensuing Motion to Intervene and to Transfer is clearly pursued on behalf of "Proposed Intervenors," and not the Plaintiff in this action. See ECF No. 9. Indeed, the motion anticipates that Plaintiff may oppose the relief sought therein. See id. Accordingly, and to ensure that the docket accurately reflects all parties, proposed parties, and their counsel, attorneys Nolan and Slossberg are directed to promptly file revised Notices of Appearance on behalf of the Proposed Intervenor(s), which Notices must identify by name each entity they represent. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on January 17, 2025. (Spears, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 8:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Slossberg on behalf of Weston Pillbox Inc. Proposed Intervenors (Slossberg, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Affidavit Thu 01/16 8:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT re9 MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer by Proposed Intervenors Signed By Joseph C. Bourne filed by Weston Pillbox Inc.. (Nolan, Erica)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Intervene Thu 01/16 7:59 PM
MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer by Proposed Intervenors by Weston Pillbox Inc..Responses due by 2/6/2025(Nolan, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 7:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Oates Nolan on behalf of Weston Pillbox Inc. Proposed Intervenors (Nolan, Erica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 01/14 3:45 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint, filed by Weston Pillbox Inc.,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,4 Electronic Filing Order,5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Tue 01/14 3:44 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Tue 01/14 3:44 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/13/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 01/14 3:41 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/13/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 01/14 3:40 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2025 Discovery due by 7/15/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2025. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 01/14 9:24 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2025.(Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/13 8:24 PM
COMPLAINT against CVS Caremark Corporation, Express Scripts Holding Company, GoodRx Holdings, Inc., GoodRx, Inc., Medimpact Healthcare Systems, Inc., Navitus Health Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8029830.), filed by Weston Pillbox Inc..(Cheveire, David)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/14 10:47 AM
Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]