Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Referred: Abizer Zanzi
Case #: 2:25-cv-00012
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/29 12:09 PM
ORDER: DeJuan McIntyre, is ORDERED to either pay the entire remaining balance of the filing fee ($350.00) or provide a written explanation showing cause why he has not paid the initial partial filing fee and any required installment payments WITH a copy of his inmate ledger showing every transaction since 2/21/2025. He is CAUTIONED that, if he does not respond by 5/26/2025, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 4/29/2025. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ely)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/16 8:57 AM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion for Status Report by Plaintiff DeJuan McIntyre. The clerk is DIRECTED to send McIntyre a copy of the docket sheet for this case. If he needs a copy of the docket sheet in the future, he does not need to file a motion. He may simply write the clerk a letter asking for the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 4/15/2025. (Copy mailed to pro se party with a copy of the docket sheet)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 12:07 PM
MOTION for Status Report by Plaintiff DeJuan McIntyre.. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/21 10:55 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF2 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, DeJuan McIntyre, IDOC # 113713, Lake County Jail # 10N24135, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $26.71 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 2/21/2025. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Lake County Jail)(ely)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/03 12:36 PM
***Amended Pleadings deadline terminated. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
5 5 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 02/03 2:48 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DeJuan McIntyre. (rmf)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/03 12:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Bunnell, Gary Henry, E. Meyer, Timothy Michels, Pavale Popovich, Aaron Ridgway, Alexander Van Rite, filed by DeJuan McIntyre.(rmf) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/3/2025) (ksc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/16 8:41 AM
ORDER: DeJuan McIntyre is GRANTED until 2/12/2025, to respond to this order and CAUTIONED that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 1/15/25. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/13 2:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff DeJuan McIntyre. (nhc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Mon 01/13 2:36 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Michael Bunnell, Gary Henry, E. Meyer, Timothy Michels, Pavale Popovich, Aaron Ridgway, Alexander Van Rite, filed by DeJuan McIntyre. (file stamped copy sent to McIntyre). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope