New York Northern District Court
Judge:David N Hurd
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 5:24-cv-01405
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause28:3205 Garnishment
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 9:07 PM EST
Claimant
Elizabeth M. DeVeau
Represented By
David G. Burch, Jr.
Barclay Damon Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey A. Deveau
Represented By
Kimberly M. Zimmer
Zimmer Law Office PLLC
contact info
Garnishee
Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Melissa O'Brien Rothbart
Office Of The United States Attorney - Syracuse
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
23 23 order Order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 02/13 3:48 PM
TEXT ORDER GRANTING FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR GOVERNMENT MOTION RESPONSE/ STATUS REPORT DEADLINE: Pursuant to the Order of the Hon. David. N. Hurd, Senior USDJ, and in light of the Order on the Joint Stipulation of Payment Schedule, the time for the Government to file a status report or respond to the13 Letter Motion for Elizabeth M. DeVeau requesting Exemption Claim and Request for Hearing and14 Letter Motion for Jeffrey A. Deveau requesting Exemption Claim and Request for Hearing, is extended to Tuesday May 27, 2025, with replies, defendant and claimant, if any, to be file no later than 5:00pm on Tuesday June 3, 2025. Related [+] So Ordered by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/13/2025. (ptm)
Related: [-] sponse to Motion due by 5/27/2025. Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/3/2025
22 22 4 pgs order Order Thu 02/13 3:36 PM
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION OF PAYMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/13/2025. (ptm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation Wed 02/12 9:33 AM
STIPULATION of Payment Schedule (Jointly Submitted) by United States of America submitted to Judge David N. Hurd. (Rothbart, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 order Order on Letter Request Tue 01/21 10:33 AM
TEXT ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR GOVERNMENT MOTION RESPONSE: Pursuant to the Order of the Hon. David. N. Hurd, Senior USDJ the19 Letter Request for an extension of time for Government to respond to Exemption Claims and Requests for Hearing, is Granted as to13 Letter Motion for Elizabeth M. DeVeau requesting Exemption Claim and Request for Hearing and14 Letter Motion for Jeffrey A. Deveau requesting Exemption Claim and Request for Hearing. The Government shall file a response(s) no later than 5:00pm on Friday February 21, 2025, with a reply if any, to be file no later than 5:00pm on Friday February 28, 2025. Related [+] So Ordered by Judge David N. Hurd on 1/21/2025. (ptm)
Related: [-] sponse to Motion due by 2/21/2025. Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/28/2025
Friday, January 17, 2025
19 19 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 01/17 4:06 PM
Letter Motion from Kimberly M. Zimmer, Esq. for Jeffrey A. Deveau requesting Extension of Time for Government to Respond to Exemption Claims and Requests for Hearing submitted to Judge Hurd . (Zimmer, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Case Mon 01/13 1:22 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Unseal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/13/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Unseal Case Mon 01/13 1:22 PM
MOTION to Unseal Case filed by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 2/3/2025 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
16 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Claim served on United States District Court Northern District of New York Clerk on 1/6/2025, filed by Elizabeth M. DeVeau.(ham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Duplicate Claim as to Elizabeth DeVeau,
Att: 2 Envelope
15 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Claim served on United States District Court Northern District of New York Clerk on 1/6/2025, filed by Jeffrey A. Deveau.(ham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Duplicate Claim as to Jeffrey DeVeau,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, January 06, 2025
14 14 Letter Request Motion for Jeffrey A. Deveau requesting Exemption Claim and Request for Hearing, submitted to Judge David N. Hurd. (ham) Modified on 1/10/2025 (jdc ).
Related: [-]
13 13 Letter Request Motion for Elizabeth M. DeVeau requesting an Exemption Claim and Request for Hearing, submitted to Judge David N. Hurd. (ham) Modified on 1/10/2025 (jdc ).
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly M. Zimmer on behalf of Jeffrey A. DeVeau. (ham)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
11 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 285 Form) Executed. Acknowledgment filed by United States of America. On 12/17/2024 the following documents were served on Jeffrey A. Deveau: Ex Parte Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment and Order granting same; Ex Parte Writ of Continuing Garnishment; Ex Parte Application to File under Seal and Order granting same; Clerk's Notice of Writ of Continuing Garnishment and Exemption Claim(s) & Request for Hearing or transfer request; Answer of Garnishee; and Letter of Instructions to Defendant. (ham)
Related: [-]
10 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 285 Form) Executed. Acknowledgment filed by United States of America. On 12/17/2024 the following documents were served on Elizabeth Deveau: Ex Parte Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment and Order granting same; Ex Parte Writ of Continuing Garnishment; Ex Parte Application to File under Seal and Order granting same; Clerk's Notice of Writ of Continuing Garnishment and Exemption Claim(s) & Request for Hearing or transfer request; Answer of Garnishee; and Letter of Instructions to interested third-party. (ham)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
9 9 ANSWER to6 Writ of Garnishment by Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. Objections to Writ Answer due by 12/26/2024.(ham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
8 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re6 Writ of Garnishment and7 Clerk's Notice of Writ of Continuing Garnishment. (tll)
Related: [-]
Set Deadline: Answer of Garnishee to Writ due by 12/5/2024. (tll)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
7 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued. (tll)
Related: [-]
6 6 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued for Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.. Answer of Garnishee to Writ due 10 days from the date of service. (tll)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting1 Motion for Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/25/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
3 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 11/20/24. (lmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
1 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment - Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. filed by United States of America. (tll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Writ of Garnishment,
Att: 2 Clerk's Notice of Garnishment,
Att: 3 Exemption Request for Hearing,
Att: 4 Answer of Garnishee,
Att: 5 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet