Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Lindsay C Jenkins
Case #: 1:25-cv-00385
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 3:13 AM CST
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Defendant
ARRLSDB
Defendant
ArceesShop
Defendant
Asunshine Shop
Represented By
Timothy Alan Duffy
Law Office Of Timothy A. Duffy, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
BDPORKAS
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
BMH-US
Defendant
Beautyai
Defendant
Beskino
Defendant
CF TQWQT
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Clearance Sales Today Deals Prime GONEBIN
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Cocsini
Defendant
Cotrida
Defendant
CylLIIjian
Defendant
Daochuxuangongsi
Defendant
Defendant No. 1
Defendant
Defendant No. 13
Defendant
Defendant No. 14
Defendant
Defendant No. 26
Defendant
Defendant No. 35
Defendant
Defendant No. 47
Defendant
Doublelift: clearance sales today
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Durtebeua
Defendant
EHQJNJ
Defendant
EHTMSAK
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
FLani
Defendant
FO&OSOBEIT
Defendant
FXX-AMZ
Defendant
Fashion Trend Clothing
Defendant
Fgvctg
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Fnapos
Defendant
GCmandwe
Defendant
GUANGYONG
Defendant
GUijsfded
Defendant
Geai Co. ltd
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Geeun
Defendant
HUMORAND
Defendant
HZDream
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Halloween & Fall/Winter Fashion Sale HanYuWang
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
IERUPQWOE
Defendant
INTOMENG-US
Defendant
JIANGYUYING
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
JXEHIUR
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jiabo
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jkdsfwq
Defendant
Jwentye
Defendant
Kiekiecoo
Defendant
Kiyya Fashion
Defendant
Klyl
Defendant
LDCDGS
Defendant
Lifehobby
Defendant
Lightning Deals of Today Prime QUFECH
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
MABUTINGTI October Sales Promotion 2024
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
MarsForce
Defendant
Monlando
Defendant
NIAIOCTI
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
PINGZHIHAODIAN
Defendant
PURJKPU
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
QWKLEAJ
Defendant
QiBuss
Defendant
Rkuupa
Defendant
RuiRuiYi Co., LTD
Defendant
Ruixinchengwangluo
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
SIYECAOH
Defendant
SK Trading Co.,
Defendant
Shengtianye Co., Ltd.
Defendant
TIKONT
Defendant
TOPION
Defendant
TUTUTUZENG
Defendant
Tianstore
Defendant
ToSinno
Defendant
Tsuki
Defendant
VBARHMQRT
Defendant
Vivianft
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
WDQ clothing
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
WRRFJLJJF
Defendant
WUYANGDEDIAN
Defendant
Wanjunyaoi
Defendant
Wavtir
Defendant
WeUniqueSJK
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Weisalu
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
WujiJia
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
XVREFD(7-14 Days Arrives)
Defendant
Xiuexe Fashion
Defendant
YANUANjai
Defendant
YAROELRD Store US
Defendant
YingWP
Defendant
Yiruolin Technologies Co Ltd
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
YouYouMao
Defendant
Yzengfg
Defendant
ZHENGHAOZHUBAO
Defendant
ZIXZMD Lightning Deals of Today Prime 2024
Defendant
ZQWY
Defendant
Zhanuwin
Defendant
ZhijianhengEcommerce
Defendant
ahonZAS
Defendant
bikahdHB
Defendant
chentin123456
Defendant
dsunrise
Defendant
ewomo
Defendant
guang zhou dan tao shi pin you xian gong si
Defendant
guangyuanhongsheng
Defendant
guohuawoqiong
Defendant
halloween costumes woman 2024 sales
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
haoyuweilai
Defendant
hengzhengmaoyi
Defendant
huiyachangshangmao1
Defendant
huresd
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
kaidianbao
Defendant
kuailedian
Defendant
llttrrui
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
lxin
Defendant
lxy-usa
Defendant
mingshengtaihe
Defendant
pwidon
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
todays daily deals clearance Aunimeifly
Defendant
yamei
Defendant
yingrun
Defendant
yongxiangfafafa
Defendant
yunzhijia
Defendant
zhenglingdian
Defendant
zhengqiufendianpu
Defendant
zhuoyikl
Defendant
zhuoyishengyun
Plaintiff
Jessica Rose Hanselmann
Represented By
Yi Bu
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Christopher Romero
Jiangip, LLC
contact info
Yanling Jiang
Jiangip, LLC
contact info
Keith A. Vogt
Keith Vogt, Ltd.
contact info
Adam Grodman
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Monica Rita Martin
Jiang Ip LLC
contact info
Cameron Eugene Mcintyre
Jiangip LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
2024 Prime Day Deals Today
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
ABPWLY
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
ASFHML
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Ajgvf
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
BONIXOOM underwear clearance
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Baikeli
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Beshee
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
CQQCLH
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
CUNSOUTH
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Chennx
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
DOLKFU Direct
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Dianli
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Ekp ZZZ
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
FH Store
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
FhsagQ
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Fufafayo
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Fukeen
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
GTMZXW
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
HONGYFEG
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Hot6sl
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
IELSKGS Clothing Shop
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
JLONEX
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
JYSwoshoe 7-15Days Arrive
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Kekivoo
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Kimoli Bag
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
LAWOR Co.Ltd
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Lighting Deals Clearance Prime Day
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Luooli(7-20 Days Delivery)
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
MAGAIY
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
MALISTLN
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
MengLe Toy
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Mifelio
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Miss Adola Store
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Misydeek
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
NaRHbrg
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
NaRHbrg Fashion
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Nianyouyu
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
POTETI CLOTH
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Prolriy Store
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Ptauao
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Pvkarhg
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Resonrose
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
SMIDOW Direct
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
SMIDOW Online
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
SRstrat Co.Ltd
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
SUANOWETA Sales Today Clearance
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Sevevn
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Sktremeuru
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Sopatenor Pro Seller
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
SpiritualityArtware
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
TANGNADE Direct
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
TSADFHJI
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
TWRWX lightning deals of today prime
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Tiitstoy ~ lightning deals of today prime
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Turilly
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Uppuppy
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
VKEKIEO Up to 50 percent off
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
VSSSJ
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Wangair.INC
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Wiyuqeen
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
WonderDesignUS
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
XFLWAM
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Xuapaodt INC
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
YINECHENCER
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
YOUYAN
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ygbgbb
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Ynmk Jun
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
Yyeselk
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
ZDRZK Direct Online
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
best-king
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
bhuZT*2H
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
biqikav
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
gjutow
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
gongxinifacaio
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
guangzhouruimiaokaikejiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
hoksml
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
mengli-dianzi
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
mutourn
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
oelaio amaz0n prime day 2024 deals
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
putianshichengxiangquxingshanbaihuoshanghang
Terminated: 02/21/2025
Defendant
vbEYYe22
Terminated: 02/21/2025


Docket last updated: 03/04/2025 2:04 AM CST
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (lj, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lj, )
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22947600.(Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
2 2 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose Schedule A to Complaint 1 (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 2/5/2025 (rc, ).
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose by Cameron Eugene Mcintyre (Mcintyre, Cameron)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose by Christopher Romero (Romero, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose by Monica Rita Martin (Martin, Monica)
Related: [-]
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jessica Rose Hanselmann d/b/a Studio Jessica Rose by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
Related: [-]