Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Case #: 1:25-cv-20198
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 5:25 AM EST
Defendant
Lewis Marine Supply, LLC
Represented By
Carrie Stolzer Robinson
Tobin & Reyes, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Yudy Hernandez
Represented By
Richard John Adams, Jr.
Adams & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Diego German Mendez
Mendez Law Offices, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 03/28 10:56 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing case with prejudice based on10 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/28/2025. (skz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 03/27 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by Yudy Hernandez (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 02/20 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Yudy Hernandez (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
8 8 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 01/31 3:32 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER staying and administratively closing case in light of7 Defendant's Report in Accordance with Notice of Court Practice. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, Defendant shall file with the Court a detailed remediation plan. Plaintiff shall have ten (10) days in which to object to Defendant's plan. If the Court determines that Defendant's remediation plan is reasonable, every ninety (90) days thereafter, Defendant shall confer with Plaintiff and file with the Court status reports regarding remediation. If requested, the Court may grant proportional discovery to verify Defendant's remediation of the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint. After verification, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed order of dismissal, which includes an injunction for future compliance and an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs. All disputes will be resolved by the Court. If the parties fail to comply with this Order or if the Court finds that either party has not acted in good faith, the Court may impose sanctions, including, but not limited to, dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/31/2025. (aci)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 misc Report Regarding Tue 01/28 5:00 PM
REPORT REGARDING Accordance with Notice of Court Practice by Lewis Marine Supply, LLC (Robinson, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 01/21 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA), 42 U.S.C. §§ 12181 et seq. In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster an early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED as follows: Within fourteen (14) days of service of the Complaint, Defendant shall file a report with the Court indicating whether it agrees to (1) remediate the deficiencies identified in the Complaint, (2) entry of an injunction to ensure future compliance, and (3) pay Plaintiff's reasonable attorneys fees and costs, as determined by the Court or agreement by the parties. If so, Defendant shall include a reasonable timeline for remediation. If, upon review of the report, the Court finds that Defendant intends to remediate the property within a reasonable time, the action shall be stayed. If requested, the Court may grant proportional discovery to verify Defendant's remediation of the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint. After receiving notice from the parties that the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint have been remediated, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed order of dismissal, including an injunction for future compliance and an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Disputes will be resolved by the Court. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/21/2025. (aci)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 01/21 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/21/2025. (aci)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 01/20 8:31 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Yudy Hernandez. Lewis Marine Supply, LLC served on 1/15/2025, response/answer due 2/5/2025. (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/14 11:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Lewis Marine Supply, LLC. (amb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 01/14 11:31 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/14 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Lewis Marine Supply, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18115976, filed by Yudy Hernandez.(Adams, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)