Colorado District Court
Judge:Gordon P Gallagher
Referred: Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:25-cv-00119
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/14 12:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) by Almintek(Sergeant, Centennial Correctional Facility, In his individual capacity).(Bast, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/02 12:42 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by U.S. Mail by Clerk of Court re18 Status Conference,, Set/Reset Deadlines,19 Scheduling Order to Arthur Walker #61612 Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000 Sterling, CO 80751 and CASE MANAGER FOR Arthur Walker #61612 Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000 Sterling, CO 80751. Text Only Entry (msmot, )
Related: [-]
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/02 12:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/17/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2025. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/2/2025. (msmot, )
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/02 12:30 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Status and Scheduling Conference held on 4/2/2025 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung: The Scheduling Order is approved and entered as stated on the record. FTR: Courtroom C205. (msmot, ) (msmot, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/2/2025) Pro Se Letter
Monday, March 24, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 03/24 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristin K. Lindemann on behalf of Almintek(Sergeant, Centennial Correctional Facility, In his individual capacity)Attorney Kristin K. Lindemann added to party Almintek(pty:dft) (Lindemann, Kristin)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 03/24 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Taylor Rae Bast on behalf of Almintek(Sergeant, Centennial Correctional Facility, In his individual capacity)Attorney Taylor Rae Bast added to party Almintek(pty:dft) (Bast, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
15 15 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 02/12 7:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Buddy Almintakh (Sergeant, Centennial Correctional Facility, In his individual capacity) waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/11 9:59 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service, by Clerk of Court re1 Complaint for Service of Process. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing/Service Mon 02/10 10:28 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing re12 Minute Order. Mailed to Arthur Walker #61612 Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000 Sterling, CO 80751 and CASE MANAGER FOR Arthur Walker #61612 Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000 Sterling, CO 80751 (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
12 12 order Minute Order Mon 02/10 10:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung pursuant to an Order of Reference entered by District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on February 7, 2025. ECF No. 11 . Pursuant to the Order of Reference, this Court will hold a Status Conference on April 2, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. Plaintiff shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Status Conference . Plaintiff shall participate in this conference by telephone. Plaintiff and his case manager, or a representative of the facility shall appear by telephone by calling the following conference line at the appointed time: Number: 571-353-2301, Access code: 198033559#. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 2/10/2025. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
11 11 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 02/07 2:58 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 2/7/2025. Text Only Entry (tlove, )
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 02/07 1:03 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (pklin, )
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Reassigning Case Fri 02/07 1:00 PM
CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to8 Order. This case has been directly reassigned to District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-00119-GPG . (Text Only Entry). (pklin, )
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 02/07 12:52 PM
Order by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 02/07/2025. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No.7 ) is accepted and adopted. FURTHER ORDERED that the retaliation claim asserted against Defendant Almintek in his official capacity is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as barred by Eleventh Amendment immunity. FURTHER ORDERED that the retaliation claim asserted against Defendant Almintek in his individual capacity for damages is ASSIGNED to District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher and Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
7 7 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 01/16 1:49 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re1 Complaint filed by Arthur Walker by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 01/16/2025. (Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2025) (pklin, )
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 01/16 11:12 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 01/16/2025. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action. (All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-00119-LTB-RTG .) (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 01/15 11:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 01/15/2025. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. (This case has been directly reassigned to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 25-00119 LTB .) (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/14 9:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915 by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 01/14/2025. ORDERED that the Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (ECF No.2 ) is granted . FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any remaining Defendants for whom personal service is required if the case is later drawn to a district judge and/or a magistrate judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c). (Copy of Order emailed as ordered.) (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 01/14 9:06 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/14 9:06 AM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Arthur Walker. (echa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/14 9:05 AM
PRISONER COMPLAINT against Almintek, filed by Arthur Walker.(echa, )
Related: [-]