California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Peterson
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00169
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 24CV024591
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 1:46 AM PST
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Evan J. Critchlow
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Robert Allen Shields
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerod L Bahn
Represented By
Kevin Y. Jacobson
Quill & Arrow LLP
contact info
Erik Kronholm Schmitt
Hackler Daghighian Martino & Novak
contact info
Robert Bard Smith
Quill & Arrow
contact info
Matthew Treybig
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill & Arrow, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/25 12:45 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/25/2025 SETTING deadlines as follows: All Discovery Shall be completed by 2/13/2026; Motions to Compel discovery due by 1/22/2026; Parties shall serve Rule 26(a) Disclosures by 3/28/2025; Initial Expert Disclosures due by 12/19/2025; Rebuttal Disclosures due by 1/9/2026; All Dispositive Motions shall be completed by 3/26/2026. (Deputy Clerk OML)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 03/17 2:02 PM
CONSENT ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 3/17/25 REASSIGNING this case to Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson for all further proceedings including entry of final judgment. All deadlines and pending dates set before Judge Calabretta are VACATED and RESET before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta is no longer associated to this case. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:25-cv-0169 JDP. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 misc Status Report Fri 03/14 4:32 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jerod L Bahn. (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
3 3 service Certificate / Proof of Service Wed 01/15 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re2 Civil New Case Documents for DJC. (Critchlow, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for DJC Tue 01/14 10:01 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Deputy Clerk AJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
Monday, January 13, 2025
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 24CV024591 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11973004)(Critchlow, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Evan J. Critchlow,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B 10K Filing,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Answer,
Att: 5 Exhibit D All Pleadings,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Notice Jury Demand,
Att: 8 Notice Interested Parties,
Att: 9 Proof of Service