New Jersey District Court
Judge:Evelyn Padin
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:25-cv-00439
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Essex County, NJ, ESX-L-52-00024
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 5:16 AM EST
Defendant
NICOLE DUFAULT
Defendant
SOUTH ORANGE-MAPLEWOOD SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By
ERIK M. CORLETT
Attwood Corlett LLC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-20
Plaintiff
JOHN DOE
Represented By
JAMES H DAVIS
Davis Advocacy & Consulting LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/28 4:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' request for their client representative to appear virtually at the May 21 initial scheduling conference (ECF No.13 ). In light of the request, the initial scheduling conference is converted to a video conference via Microsoft Teams. The Court will provide the dial-in information in advance. The senior attorney in charge of the case and client(s) with full settlement authority must be present. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/28/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Wed 04/23 2:11 PM
Letter re 11 Text Order,,,. (CORLETT, ERIK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 misc Letter Wed 04/09 12:22 PM
Letter from Erik M. Corlett requesting Pre-Motion Hearing. (CORLETT, ERIK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 order Text Order Mon 04/07 9:55 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court intends to engage the parties in settlement discussions at the initial scheduling conference scheduled for May 21, 2025. The senior attorney in charge of the case and client(s) with full settlement authority shall appear in person at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 8, Newark, New Jersey. In addition to filing the joint discovery plan (see ECF No. 9), on or before May 14, 2025, the parties shall submit confidential letters of five (5) pages or less to Chambers summarizing the relevant facts, legal disputes, status of the case, and their respective settlement positions. Please send the papers via email to jra_orders@njd.uscourts.gov.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/7/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/03 8:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOHN DOE.(DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Sat 03/29 11:04 AM
LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 5/21/2025 at 3:00 PM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Counsel shall appear in person at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 8, Newark, New Jersey. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/28/2025. (akw) (akw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 order Text Order Wed 03/05 9:26 AM
TEXT ORDER: Per the parties' agreement at the conference of 3/4/25, Plaintiff shall have 30 days to amend the complaint. The parties also agreed to attend a settlement conference at a later date before the Hon. Judge Almonte. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 3/5/2025. (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 03/05 9:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Evelyn Padin: Pre-Motion Telephone Conference held on 3/4/2025 off the record. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
7 7 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 02/20 9:03 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a Pre-Motion Teleconference on 3/4/2025 at 12:00 PM before Judge Evelyn Padin. Dial-in number [973-437-5535], Phone Conference ID [885000902#]. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 2/20/2025. (bt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Mon 02/10 7:54 AM
Letter from James H. Davis III, Esq.. (DAVIS, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 misc Letter Mon 02/03 10:56 AM
Letter from Erik M. Corlett requesting Pre-Motion Hearing re 4 Text Order,,, Terminate Motions,,. (CORLETT, ERIK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 order Text Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 01/27 2:57 PM
TEXT ORDER: Despite this Court's preferences, Defendant South Orange-Maplewood Board of Education has filed a motion to dismiss without first filing a pre- motion letter. D.E.3 . Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE D.E.3 . In addition to reviewing this Court's preferences, by 2/3/25, Defendant shall file said pre-motion letter. Plaintiff shall respond within 1 week. At that time, the Court will review the letters to determine whether a conference is necessary and/or whether the motion can immediately proceed. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/27/2025. (bt)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/27 11:53 AM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
3 3 motion Dismiss Fri 01/24 1:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by SOUTH ORANGE-MAPLEWOOD SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION. Responses due by 2/4/2025.(CORLETT, ERIK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Declaration of Erik M. Corlett, Esq.,
Att: 4 Exhibit A Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit B Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit C VR V. Bergen County, et al.,
Att: 7 Exhibit D Hornor v. Upper Freehold, et al.,
Att: 8 Exhibit E YG v. Bd. of Educ., et al.,
Att: 9 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
2 2 misc Declaration Tue 01/14 4:20 PM
DECLARATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 11.2 by SOUTH ORANGE-MAPLEWOOD SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION. (CORLETT, ERIK)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/14 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SOUTH ORANGE-MAPLEWOOD SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION from Superior Court of Essex County, case number ESX-L-6552-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15939917), filed by SOUTH ORANGE-MAPLEWOOD SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION.(CORLETT, ERIK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/14 5:15 PM
Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte added. (ps)
Related: [-]