Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:25-cv-00088
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 1:23 AM PST
Defendant
Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC
Plaintiff
Lixin Azarmehr
Represented By
Jared Butcher
Berliner Corcoran & Rowe LLP
contact info
Melvin White
Berliner Corcoran Rowe LLP
contact info
Dominic P. Gentile
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
William Francis Coffield, IV
Berliner, Corcoran & Rowe, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JL Real Estate Development Corporation
Represented By
Jared Butcher
Berliner Corcoran & Rowe LLP
contact info
Melvin White
Berliner Corcoran Rowe LLP
contact info
Dominic P. Gentile
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
William Francis Coffield, IV
Berliner, Corcoran & Rowe, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC
Represented By
Jared Butcher
Berliner Corcoran & Rowe LLP
contact info
Melvin White
Berliner Corcoran Rowe LLP
contact info
Dominic P. Gentile
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
William Francis Coffield, IV
Berliner, Corcoran & Rowe, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC
Represented By
Jared Butcher
Berliner Corcoran & Rowe LLP
contact info
Melvin White
Berliner Corcoran Rowe LLP
contact info
Dominic P. Gentile
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
William Francis Coffield, IV
Berliner, Corcoran & Rowe, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
31 31 minord Minute Order Fri 05/02 3:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/2/2025. The parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order ("DPSO") is past due in this case. ECF No. 15 (setting DPSO deadline for 4/21/2025); see also LR 26-1(a). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties must file a proposed DPSO by 5/16/2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BCI)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
30 30 motion Motion Dismiss Fri 04/25 7:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss24 Amended Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. Responses due by 5/9/2025.(Kutasi, Callie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Decl. of Geoff Beckham,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Monday, April 07, 2025
29 29 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/08 12:12 PM
ORDER Granting28 Stipulation for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the foregoing stipulation is approved and the deadline for Defendant to file its motion to dismiss the amended complaint is April 25, 2025. Plaintiffs' opposition is due by May 23, 2025. Defendant's reply is due by June 13, 2025. Motions due by 4/25/2025. Responses due by 5/23/2025. Replies due by 6/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/7/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
28 28 motion Stipulation Wed 04/02 10:10 AM
Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Respond to Amended Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule by Defendant Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. (Kutasi, Callie) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Wed 04/02 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Callie Kutasi on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. (Kutasi, Callie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/31 1:44 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the defendant's15 motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot because it is directed at the original complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/31/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Errata Mon 03/31 10:12 AM
ERRATA to24 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Lixin Azarmehr, JL Real Estate Development Corporation, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC.(Dzarnoski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Friday, March 28, 2025
24 24 28 pgs cmp Complaint Amended Fri 03/28 1:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC, Lixin Azarmehr, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, JL Real Estate Development Corporation. No changes to parties. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 3:44 PM
ORDER Granting20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Callie Kutasi for Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael Ayers. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/13/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
22 22 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 3:39 PM
ORDER Granting19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emmet P. Ong for Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael Ayers. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/13/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
21 21 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/14 3:14 PM
ORDER Granting18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Josh C. Hess for Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael Ayers. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/13/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) Modified on 3/14/2025 to correct docket text. NEF regenerated. (RJDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 03/12 5:37 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Callie Kutasi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael R. Ayers (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7984134) by Defendant Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. (Ayers, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 03/12 5:33 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Emmet P. Ong and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael R. Ayers (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7984129) by Defendant Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. (Ayers, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Wed 03/12 5:26 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Josh C. Hess and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael R. Ayers (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7984108) by Defendant Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. (Ayers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 notice Notice Other Fri 03/07 2:06 PM
NOTICE : Defendant's Disclosure Statement Under FRCP 7.1 by Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. (Ayers, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 03/07 1:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ayers, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion Dismiss Fri 03/07 1:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,, by Defendant Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC. Responses due by 3/21/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/21/2025.(Ayers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Decl. of Geoff Beckham,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/06 11:36 AM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and set Briefing schedule. Motions due by 3/7/2025. Responses due by 4/4/2025. Replies due by 4/25/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/5/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
13 13 motion Stipulation Tue 02/04 11:47 AM
Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Respond to Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs Lixin Azarmehr, JL Real Estate Development Corporation, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC. (Butcher, Jared) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/24 2:33 PM
ORDER Granting9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melvin White and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Mark S. Dzarnoski. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/23/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
11 11 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/24 2:30 PM
ORDER Granting8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William F. Coffield, IV and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Mark S. Dzarnoski. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/23/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
10 10 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/24 2:26 PM
ORDER Granting7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jared R. Butcher and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Mark S. Dzarnoski. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/23/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Thu 01/23 9:44 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Melvin White and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark S. Dzarnoski (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7933137) by Plaintiffs Lixin Azarmehr, JL Real Estate Development Corporation, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Thu 01/23 9:36 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William F. Coffield, IV and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark S. Dzarnoski (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7933112) by Plaintiffs Lixin Azarmehr, JL Real Estate Development Corporation, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Thu 01/23 9:32 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jared R. Butcher and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark S. Dzarnoski (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7933069) by Plaintiffs Lixin Azarmehr, JL Real Estate Development Corporation, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/21 9:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC, Lixin Azarmehr, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, JL Real Estate Development Corporation re1 Complaint,,. Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC served on 1/15/2025. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 01/16 10:09 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lixin Azarmehr, JL Real Estate Development Corporation, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dzarnoski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order Wed 01/15 8:48 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/14 5:12 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC re1 Complaint. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Tue 01/14 4:54 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jared Butcher, Melvin White, William F. Coffield, IV to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER[LINK:www.pacer.gov] to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/28/2025. (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/14 1:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC (a/k/a Wells Fargo Advisors) (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7924712) by Nevada Skilled Nursing Development, LLC, Lixin Azarmehr, Nevada Skilled Nursing Lender, LLC, JL Real Estate Development Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/24/2025. Proof of service due by 4/14/2025. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 01/14 4:52 PM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (AMMi)
Related: [-]