Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:25-cv-00139
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause26:7431 IRS: Unauthorized Disclosure of Return & Return Info
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc.
Plaintiff
Safe Harbor International LLC
Represented By
Nathaniel K Risch
Mann & Risch LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 04/11 2:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alarm Concepts, Inc.. Internal Revenue Service served on 2/3/2025, answer due 4/4/2025; U.S. Department of the Treasury served on 2/3/2025, answer due 4/4/2025.(Nannis, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
21 21 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 04/11 1:35 PM
QC NOTICE:19 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Alarm Concepts, Inc.,20 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Alarm Concepts, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Please refile using the event "Summons Returned Executed as to USA". (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/10 5:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alarm Concepts, Inc.. U.S. Department of the Treasury served on 2/3/2025, answer due 3/21/2025.(Nannis, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/10 4:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alarm Concepts, Inc.. Internal Revenue Service served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025; U.S. Department of the Treasury served on 2/28/2025, answer due 3/21/2025.(Nannis, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
18 18 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 04/10 4:15 PM
QC NOTICE:17 Certificate of Service filed by Alarm Concepts, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Please refile using the event "Summons Returned Executed". (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/10 3:24 PM
(FILED IN ERROR) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alarm Concepts, Inc.(Nannis, Veronica) Modified on 4/10/2025 (ybs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation Fri 04/04 11:51 AM
STIPULATION by Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury(Willingham, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S. Willingham on behalf of Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Department of the Treasury (Willingham, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
14 14 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 03/28 4:20 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Alarm Concepts, Inc., Belpointe Sleepovation Investment, LP, Safe Harbor International LLC(Ulwick, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 27, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 03/27 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James J Pizzirusso (Pizzirusso, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
12 12 3 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 3:30 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING cases; DIRECTING parties to make all future filings under lead case 25-cv-00139; DIRECTING parties to adhere to briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 3/18/2025. Associated Cases: 8:25-cv-00139-LKG, 8:25-cv-00179-LKG, 8:25-cv-00228-LKG(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 11:39 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Israel Rosenberg. Directing attorney Israel Rosenberg to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 11:36 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Philip Fraietta. Directing attorney Philip Fraietta to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/05 1:32 PM
NOTICE by Alarm Concepts, Inc., Belpointe Sleepovation Investment, LP, Safe Harbor International LLC Notice of Intent to File Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Associated Cases: 8:25-cv-00139-LKG, 8:25-cv-00179-LKG, 8:25-cv-00228-LKG(Ulwick, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 11:46 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Israel Rosenberg (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11821403.) by Safe Harbor International LLC(Risch, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 11:44 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Philip L. Fraietta (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11821311.) by Safe Harbor International LLC(Risch, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
6 6 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 01/29 8:31 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Safe Harbor International LLC (Risch, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
5 5 notice Deficiency Notice Tue 01/28 9:41 AM
Deficiency Notice -Safe Harbor International LLC- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 2/4/2025 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 01/28 9:37 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by Safe Harbor International LLC was filed incorrectly. **Not all pdf documents were flattened prior to filing. All pdfs uploaded to CM/ECF MUST BE FLATTENED for all future filings. Failure to comply may result in rejected filings and delays in case processing. **This filing has been corrected by court staff and no further corrective action is required. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/28 9:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Booze Allen Hamilton, Inc.. Booze Allen Hamilton, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2025, answer due 3/24/2025.(Risch, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/24 12:15 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
2 2 order Case Management Order Wed 01/15 12:36 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/15/2025. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/14 5:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Booze Allen Hamilton, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11708665.), filed by Safe Harbor International LLC.(Risch, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet