Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Referred: Russell G Vineyard
Case #: 1:25-cv-00130
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:l332 Diversity - Foreclosure
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 4:59 AM EST
Defendant
Capital Funding
Defendant
Civic Financial Services, LLC
Defendant
FCI
Defendant
Lending Home Funding Corp/Kiavi
Plaintiff
Dexter Hull
4483 Lionshead Circle
Lithonia, GA 30038


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 03/25 3:56 PM
Submission of3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendation Mon 03/24 2:12 PM
OBJECTIONS to3 Report and Recommendation filed by Dexter Hull. (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendation Mon 03/10 3:43 PM
OBJECTIONS to3 Report and Recommendation filed by Dexter Hull. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Tue 02/18 4:16 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 2/18/2025. (ane)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP Tue 02/18 4:14 PM
ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Complaint. Hull's1 Application to proceed in forma pauperis, is GRANTED, but it is RECOMMENDED that his complaint, be DISMISSED for failure to state any plausible federal claim under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 2/18/2025. (ane)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 02/18 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dexter Hull.(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/18 4:17 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dexter Hull re3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/14 2:50 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/14 2:48 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dexter Hull.(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet