Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-01004
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Terminated:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 15, 2025 2:15 AM EST
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Toni B. Schnellinger Feisthamel
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Akron
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Henry Lamont Caldwell (1)
Terminated: 01/13/2025
Represented By
Lawrence L. Delino, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/15/2025 2:43 AM EST
Monday, January 13, 2025
Arrest (Rule 40) of Henry Lamont Caldwell (1) on 1/13/2025. (P,G)
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Henry Lamont Caldwell (1). Defendant arrested. (P,G)
Related: [-]
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Lawrence L. Delino, Jr for Henry Lamont Caldwell. Counsel must report to the Court any significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation.
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Henry Lamont Caldwell (1) held on 1/13/2025. AUSA Toni Schnellinger present for the government. Attorney Lawrence Delino present and appointed to represent defendant. Defendant present. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), to disclose evidence favorable to the defendant and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to comply with Brady and its progeny. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including dismissal of the indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Defendant advised of charge(s). Defendant waived reading of the indictment. Government moves for detention. Defendant waives identity hearing and detention hearing, waiver executed. Court accepts waiver. Defendant remanded to custody of U.S. Marshal to be transported to the charging district. (Court Reporter ECRO: D. Beatrice) Time: 15 minutes. (P,G)
Related: [-]
Notice to Southern District of Ohio of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Henry Lamont Caldwell (1). Your case number is: 1:25cr3. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entry via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:4 Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing,3 Financial Affidavit - CJA23,5 Warrant of Removal Issued. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to ohndml_InterDistrictTransfer@ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (P,G)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs Rule 40 Warrant received as to Henry Lamont Caldwell (1)(P,G)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Redacted indictment
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Henry Lamont Caldwell (1).(P,G)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Henry Lamont Caldwell (1) (P,G)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Warrant of Removal to Southern District of Ohio Issued as to Henry Lamont Caldwell (1) by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (P,G)
Related: [-]