California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jennifer E Niemann
Case #: 1:25-bk-10089
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Feb 21, 2025
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025

Debtor
Elizabeth Peterson Group Inc.
PO Box 6620
Pine Mountain Club, CA 93222-6620
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Shinbrot
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeffrey M. Vetter
PO Box 2424
Bakersfield, CA 93303
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
United States Courthouse 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1401
Fresno, CA 93721


Docket last updated: 01/15/2025 12:45 AM PST
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload Tue 01/14 4:30 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $0.00) (Jeffrey S. Shinbrot) (eFilingID: 7443198)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility First Meeting - 7 Business Tue 01/14 4:36 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 2/21/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Vetter: Meeting ID 996 842 7742, Passcode 6976282337, Phone 1 (661) 679-8541. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice DO NOT USE Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form) Tue 01/14 4:40 PM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Jeffrey M. Vetter (auto)
Related: [-]