Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa G Wood
Referred: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Case #: 2:25-cv-00014
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Five Rivers Hospitality, LLC
Defendant
Daniel Loube
Plaintiff
Monica Oliver
Represented By
Ian Laszlo Pham Kecskes
Hill, Kertscher & Wharton
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, January 20, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/20 9:28 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monica Oliver. (Kecskes, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 01/15 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Five Rivers Hospitality, LLC, Daniel Loube. (gmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Rule 26(f) Order Wed 01/15 9:12 AM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/15/2025. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 9:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Five Rivers Hospitality, LLC, Daniel Loube, filed by Monica Oliver. Filing Fee paid, $405.00, Receipt #AGASDC-3976681. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet