Peters v. SVP Sewing Brands, LLC
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie A Gallagher |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00151 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Removal-Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2025 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Harford County, Maryland, C-12-CV-24-000881 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:38 AM EST |
Defendant
SVP Sewing Brands, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan L. Peters
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MARGINAL ORDER Approving17 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/26/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC(Trujillo Esmeral, Daniel) |
|
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/7/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, March 03, 2025 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 03/03 3:47 PM
Telephone Conference held on 3/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (rc2s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 02/28 9:02 AM
Mediation held on 2/27/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (kmts, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, February 20, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/20 3:16 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of C. Eric Stevens. Directing attorney C. Eric Stevens to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Thursday, February 27, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/4/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/31/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER GRANTING11 Joint Motion for Modification of Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/29/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct7 Scheduling Order Modification of Initial Scheduling Order, and Report on Discovery by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C. Eric Stevens (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11733802.) by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC identifying Other Affiliate SVP-Singer Holdings LLC, Party with Financial Interest Federal Insurance Company, Party with Financial Interest The Chubb Corporation, Party with Financial Interest Chubb Limited for SVP Sewing Brands, LLC.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) |
|
8 | 8
![]() RESPONSE re4 Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/30/2025. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/22/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to3 Complaint by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Trujillo Esmeral on behalf of SVP Sewing Brands, LLC (Trujillo Esmeral, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
misc
Civil Case Filing Fee
Thu 01/16 12:56 PM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number AMDDC-11712995(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
![]() STATE COURT COMPLAINT against SVP Sewing Brands, LLC, filed by Peters Joan.(heps, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 01/15 3:31 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Notice of Removal, filed by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Not all pdf documents were flattened prior to filing. All pdfs uploaded to CM/ECF MUST BE FLATTENED for all future filings. Failure to comply may result in rejected filings and delays in case processing. **This filing has been corrected by court staff and no further corrective action is required (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Harford County, Maryland, case number C-12-CV-24-000881., filed by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) (heps) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
misc
Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee
Wed 01/15 1:11 PM
The case of Joan v. SVP Sewing Brands, LLC , has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 1:25-cv-00151-SAG . PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours . To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents . Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
||
utility
Remark - State Court Docs
Wed 01/15 3:35 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HARFORD COUNTY, MARYLAND. (heps, Deputy Clerk) |