Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:25-cv-00151
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Removal-Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Harford County, Maryland, C-12-CV-24-000881
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:38 AM EST
Defendant
SVP Sewing Brands, LLC
Represented By
Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
C. Eric Stevens
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Daniel Trujillo Esmeral
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joan L. Peters
Represented By
John B Stolarz
The Stolarz Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/26 10:44 AM
MARGINAL ORDER Approving17 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/26/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/25 8:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC(Trujillo Esmeral, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
16 16 order Settlement Order Fri 03/07 2:50 PM
SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/7/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 03/03 3:47 PM
Telephone Conference held on 3/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 02/28 9:02 AM
Mediation held on 2/27/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (kmts, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 3:16 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of C. Eric Stevens. Directing attorney C. Eric Stevens to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
14 14 3 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Tue 02/04 3:43 PM
LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Thursday, February 27, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/4/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/31 8:42 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey for Settlement. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/31/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 01/29 4:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING11 Joint Motion for Modification of Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/29/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Amend/Correct Wed 01/29 12:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct7 Scheduling Order Modification of Initial Scheduling Order, and Report on Discovery by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/28 5:05 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C. Eric Stevens (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11733802.) by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
9 9 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 01/22 4:03 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC identifying Other Affiliate SVP-Singer Holdings LLC, Party with Financial Interest Federal Insurance Company, Party with Financial Interest The Chubb Corporation, Party with Financial Interest Chubb Limited for SVP Sewing Brands, LLC.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Response Wed 01/22 3:54 PM
RESPONSE re4 Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/22 3:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/30/2025. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/22/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/22 11:50 AM
Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to3 Complaint by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Trujillo Esmeral on behalf of SVP Sewing Brands, LLC (Trujillo Esmeral, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
misc Civil Case Filing Fee Thu 01/16 12:56 PM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number AMDDC-11712995(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
4 4 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Wed 01/15 3:35 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 3:34 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against SVP Sewing Brands, LLC, filed by Peters Joan.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Information Report
2 2 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 01/15 3:31 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Notice of Removal, filed by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Not all pdf documents were flattened prior to filing. All pdfs uploaded to CM/ECF MUST BE FLATTENED for all future filings. Failure to comply may result in rejected filings and delays in case processing. **This filing has been corrected by court staff and no further corrective action is required (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 01/15 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Harford County, Maryland, case number C-12-CV-24-000881., filed by SVP Sewing Brands, LLC.(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) (heps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 4 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal,
Att: 5 Notice of Filing of Removal (State)
Att: 6 (1/15/2025) FLATTENED Civil Cover Sheet
misc Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee Wed 01/15 1:11 PM
The case of Joan v. SVP Sewing Brands, LLC , has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 1:25-cv-00151-SAG . PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours . To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents . Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - State Court Docs Wed 01/15 3:35 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HARFORD COUNTY, MARYLAND. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]