Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 2:25-bk-10176
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Chestnut Med LP
5600 Chestnut St
Philadelphia, PA 19139-3232
Represented By
JOHN EVERETT COOK
The Law Offices Of Everett Cook, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of United States Trustee Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building 900 Market Street Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19107


Docket last updated: 01/14/2025 7:00 PM EST
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 01/15 12:21 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10176 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A26257053. Fee Amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 26 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 01/15 12:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Chestnut Med LP. Chapter 11 Sm Business Plan due by 07/14/2025. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 07/14/2025. Corporate Resolution due 01/29/2025.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 02/14/2025 (COOK, JOHN)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Matrix List of Creditors Wed 01/15 12:19 PM
Matrix List of Creditors Filed. Number of pages filed: 1, Filed by JOHN EVERETT COOK on behalf of Chestnut Med LP. (COOK, JOHN) **Modified on 1/15/2025 to correct number of pages filed.** (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Credit Counseling Wed 01/15 12:20 PM
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by JOHN EVERETT COOK on behalf of Chestnut Med LP. (COOK, JOHN)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 01/16 8:26 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by JOHN EVERETT COOK on behalf of Chestnut Med LP . (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Equity Security Holders Thu 01/16 8:27 AM
Equity Security Holders Filed by JOHN EVERETT COOK on behalf of Chestnut Med LP . (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 01/16 8:28 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by JOHN EVERETT COOK on behalf of Chestnut Med LP . (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-]