New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:25-cv-00548
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 5:33 AM EST
Defendant
20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC
Represented By
ANTHONY SANGO
Ansell Grimm & Aaron
contact info
SETH MICHAEL ROSENSTEIN
Ansell Grimm & Aaron, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JULIET PAYSEUR
Represented By
ANTHONY SANGO
Ansell Grimm & Aaron
contact info
SETH MICHAEL ROSENSTEIN
Ansell Grimm & Aaron, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
EMILY GOLDBERG
Doj-Usao
contact info
NICOLE TAYKHMAN
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/19 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN ERENA LEGOMSKY on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (LEGOMSKY, KATHRYN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Wed 05/14 4:46 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/14/2025. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Wed 05/14 9:51 AM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney NICOLE TAYKHMAN terminated. (TAYKHMAN, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 05/13 4:13 PM
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by 20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC, JULIET PAYSEUR. (ROSENSTEIN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Mon 04/14 12:02 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT; that Defendants shall file an answer to the Complaint on or before May 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/14/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 04/11 3:07 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by 20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC, JULIET PAYSEUR. (ROSENSTEIN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Tue 03/25 1:44 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT; that Defendants shall file an answer to the Complaint on or before April 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/25/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 03/24 3:45 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by 20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC, JULIET PAYSEUR. (ROSENSTEIN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/03 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY SANGO on behalf of JULIET PAYSEUR, 20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC (SANGO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/21 4:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2025, answer due 3/24/2025; JULIET PAYSEUR waiver sent on 1/21/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (TAYKHMAN, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SETH MICHAEL ROSENSTEIN on behalf of JULIET PAYSEUR, 20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC (ROSENSTEIN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 10:52 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to 20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC, JULIET PAYSEUR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY GOLDBERG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GOLDBERG, EMILY)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/16 7:01 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against 20-22 MCGREGOR AVENUE, LLC, JULIET PAYSEUR, filed by UNITED STATES.(TAYKHMAN, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet