Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 1:25-cv-00021
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 3:41 AM CST
Defendant
Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc.
Plaintiff
Treshawn Council
Represented By
Christopher Thomas Kirchmer
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Beaumont
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/30 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Boyd Wells, IV on behalf of Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. (Wells, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 9:28 AM
Acknowledgement of Joint Stipulation of Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Gross Negligence Claim. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/28/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/28 12:46 PM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Gross Negligence Claim by Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc.. (Fauntleroy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
12 12 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Tue 04/22 8:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2026 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 8/3/2026 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/21/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Mon 04/21 3:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 4/21/2025 from 2:37 PM - 3:10 PM. Parties discussed status of case. Court will enter scheduling order. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher Kirchmer; Defense - John Fauntleroy, Jr., Mitchell Powell. No exhibits. (Court Reporter - Not Recorded) (KMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 04/17 10:37 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fauntleroy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 04/14 6:12 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. Re: Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Powell, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 7 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Mon 03/17 3:50 PM
ORDER that parties are to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before 4/3/2025. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2025 at 02:30 PM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/17/2025. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/14 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jude Des Bordes on behalf of Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. (Des Bordes, Jude)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/14 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitchell Ryan Powell on behalf of Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. (Powell, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 03/14 4:28 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. (Fauntleroy, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/14 4:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc..(Fauntleroy, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/25 2:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Treshawn Council. Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. served on 2/13/2025. (Kirchmer, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/15 2:04 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. and emailed back to attorney for service. (KMH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10620779.), filed by Treshawn Council.(Kirchmer, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/15 1:59 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (KMH)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 01/15 2:00 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Treshawn Council. (KMH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 01/15 2:01 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (KMH)
Related: [-]