California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00387
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24SMCV05545
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 1:56 AM PST
Defendant
Soho Works 9000 Sunset LLC
Represented By
Andrew C. Burnquist
Baker And Hostetler LLP
contact info
Shareef Swamy Farag
Baker And Hostetler LLP
contact info
Christopher Habashy
Baker And Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Vicki Valery
Represented By
Lilit Gasparyan
Laurel Employment Law
contact info
Joshua Ittan White
Laurel Employment Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
13 13 order Dismissing Case Sun 03/23 7:24 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has been advised that this action has been settled12 . The Court therefore ORDERS that this action is hereby DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 45 days, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
12 12 notice Settlement Fri 03/14 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Vicki Valery. (White, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
10 10 misc Mail Returned Mon 02/03 2:30 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Lilit Gasparyan, Laurel Employment Law, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge6 . (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 misc Mail Returned Fri 02/14 4:29 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Lilit Gasparyan re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program5 . (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 01/24 10:15 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 01/23 11:26 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 cs_rasgn Reassign Case upon Recusal of Magistrate Judge (CV-110) Tue 01/21 4:47 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-00387 AB(KSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 01/16 9:52 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 01/16 9:51 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 01/16 9:51 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 01/15 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Soho Works 9000 Sunset LLC, identifying VICKI VALERY. (Habashy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 01/15 1:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Soho Works 9000 Sunset LLC. (Habashy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/15 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 24SMCV05545 Receipt No: ACACDC-38916104 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Soho Works 9000 Sunset LLC. (Attorney Christopher Habashy added to party Soho Works 9000 Sunset LLC(pty:dft))(Habashy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 01/16 9:42 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Soho Works 9000 Sunset LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Vicki Valery. [FILED IN STATE COURT 11/08/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 01/16 9:44 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Soho Works 9000 Sunset LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT 01/13/2025 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]