New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-00265
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:40 AM EST
Defendant
Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc.
Represented By
Alexandra Leigh Simels
Martenson, Hasbrouck & Simon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Sylvester-Nicholas
Represented By
Daniel Joseph Grace
Danny Grace PLLC
contact info
Yuting Li
Danny Grace PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Thu 05/15 11:50 AM
REPORT of Mediation Settled in principle. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 5/29/2025. (JR)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Thu 05/15 12:56 PM
ORDER: In light of the parties' settlement in principle, all deadlines are adjourned sine die . The parties shall file the stipulation of dismissal by May 29, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 5/15/2025. (GWM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Mon 05/12 5:14 PM
Letter discovery status update by Donna Sylvester-Nicholas (Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Mon 05/12 5:35 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report by June 12, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 5/12/2025. (GWM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
adr Selection of Mediator Thu 04/17 12:47 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Holly Weiss selected as Mediator. Date Time and Location in-person/remote: May 14, 2025 Related [+]. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation. For more details on the submission, please consult Local Civil Rule 83.8(b)(4). Attendance is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Mediators contact information can be found on the docket sheet. Within fourteen days of the conclusion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report. (JR)
Related: [-] mote
Monday, April 14, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Mon 04/14 7:03 PM
Letter to apprise this Court of the status of discovery per this Court's Order of March 14, 2025 by Donna Sylvester-Nicholas (Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 04/14 11:22 PM
ORDER - The parties shall file a joint status report by May 12, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/14/2025. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 12:29 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Jessica E. Chang Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18891076 by Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc.. (Chang, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jessica E. Chang, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee Receipt
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 1:44 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 3/26/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/25 5:48 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc.. (Simels, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/25 5:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Northeastern Conference Corporation of Seventh-Day Adventists for Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc.. (Simels, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 03/14 1:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo: An initial conference was held on the record on March 14, 2025. Counsel appeared. The parties' proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order was discussed. Following that discussion, the Court set the below deadlines. The date for completion of automatic disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) shall be March 5, 2025. No amendment of the pleadings will be permitted after April 28, 2025. No additional parties may be joined after April 28, 2025. The parties shall file a joint status report by April 14, 2025 outlining the current status of discovery. All discovery shall be completed by September 15, 2025. The parties do not anticipate expert discovery. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed by September 15, 2025. The final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice, if any, shall be September 22, 2025. The parties are referred to the Court-annexed mediation program. The parties shall select a mediator by May 2, 2025. Mediation shall be completed by June 20, 2025. Discovery is not stayed pending mediation. No extension of the above deadlines will be granted except upon a motion, filed prior to the deadline and consistent with Judge Marutollo's Individual Practices and Rules, showing good cause for the extension. The parties are reminded that "a finding of 'good cause' depends on the diligence of the moving party." Parker v. Columbia Pictures Industries, 204 F.3d 326, 340 (2d Cir. 2000). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, the Court has an obligation "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding." (ZoomGov Log #11:03-11:12.) (EG)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Fri 03/14 3:21 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS: Mediation instructions for counsel are available[LINK:on the Court's website] . Counsel should select a mediator and schedule the initial mediation session with their chosen mediator. Once scheduled, counsel must file their selection using the [LINK:Selection of Mediator Form] . A list of EDNY Panel Mediators is available on the [LINK:Court's website] . EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with [LINK:EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)] . The Confidentiality Stipulation [LINK:in-person] or [LINK:remote] must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a [LINK:Mediation Report] to the ADR Department. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 03/07 4:14 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order for the initial conference call of March 14, 2025 per this Court's Order of January 17, 2025 by Donna Sylvester-Nicholas (Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 6:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna Sylvester-Nicholas. (Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Leigh Simels on behalf of Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Simels, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/17 5:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on March 14, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. To participate in the conference, the parties shall dial (646) 828-7666; Meeting ID: 160 331 7884 Passcode: 578270. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than March 9, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 1/17/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
8 8 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/17 11:39 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 01/17 11:36 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 11:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc.. (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/17 11:29 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/16 5:42 PM
Proposed Summons. by Donna Sylvester-Nicholas (Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yuting Li on behalf of Donna Sylvester-Nicholas (aty to be noticed) (Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 01/15 4:56 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Donna Sylvester-Nicholas (Grace, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT SIGNED VERSION against Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc. a/k/a Northeastern Conference of SDA Corporation d/b/a Northeastern Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Donna Sylvester-Nicholas. (Grace, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Northeastern Conference of S.D.A. Community Affairs, Inc. a/k/a Northeastern Conference of SDA Corporation d/b/a Northeastern Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18669096 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Donna Sylvester-Nicholas. (Grace, Daniel)
Related: [-]