Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:25-cv-00074
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:49 AM CST
Defendant
InsideRE LLC
Plaintiff
Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
Represented By
Darlene Ghavimi
Spencer Fane, LLP
contact info
Stewart Mesher
Spencer Fane
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/15 10:12 AM
Text Order GRANTING7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before May 14, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aclc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 04/15 11:19 AM
Reset Answer Deadline: InsideRE LLC answer due 5/14/2025. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/10 8:33 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Ghavimi, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/25 12:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. as to InsideRE LLC. Waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Ghavimi, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 01/16 11:53 AM
Summons Issued as to InsideRE LLC. (kp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
4 4 1 pgs misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Wed 01/15 4:20 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. (Mesher, Stewart)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 01/15 4:18 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mesher, Stewart)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 01/15 4:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. (Mesher, Stewart)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19673114), filed by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC.(Mesher, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/16 11:51 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 01/16 11:52 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 01/16 11:52 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (kp)
Related: [-]