Nebraska District Court
Judge:Joseph F Bataillon
Referred: Ryan C Carson
Case #: 8:25-cv-00016
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Case in other court:USDC - Nebraska, 8:24cv00499
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 3:34 AM CST
Defendant
TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew G. Munro
Mcgrath, North Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew G. Munro
Mcgrath, North Law Firm
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Edward Carr
Represented By
Salvatore J. Graziano
Bernstein, Litowitz Law Firm
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Michael Davis
Represented By
Salvatore J. Graziano
Bernstein, Litowitz Law Firm
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Mary Loughran
Represented By
Salvatore J. Graziano
Bernstein, Litowitz Law Firm
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Terrance TJ McDonald
Represented By
Salvatore J. Graziano
Bernstein, Litowitz Law Firm
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Rosemary Orlando
Represented By
Salvatore J. Graziano
Bernstein, Litowitz Law Firm
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
Donald Saunders
Represented By
Salvatore J. Graziano
Bernstein, Litowitz Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Djakarta A. Jacobs
Represented By
Joshua R. Jacobson
Jacobson, Phillips PLLC
contact info
Jacob L. Phillips
Jacobson, Phillips PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 24 2025
Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)ORDER - Plaintiffs' unopposed motions to extend are granted. (Filing No. 38 in Case No. 8:24-cv-499; Filing No. 26 in Case No. 8:25-cv-16). The response brief as to the pending Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay, (Filing No. 32 in Case No. 8:24-cv-499, and Filing No. 18 in Case No. 8:25-cv- 16) is now due on April 7, 2025. Any reply as to the motion to transfer shall be filed in accordance with the Local
GPO Apr 10 2025
ORDER - Defendants' unopposed motions to extend are granted. (Filing No. 42 in Case No. 8:24-cv-499; Filing No. 30 in Case No. 8:25-cv-16). The reply brief as to the pending Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay, (Filing No. 32 in Case No. 8:24-cv-499, and Filing No. 18 in Case No. 8:25-cv- 16) is now due on April 28, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
33 33 oth_doc Index Mon 04/28 9:38 PM
INDEX in support of MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay 18 Supplemental Index by Attorney Matthew G. Munro on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Munro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-20 (Corrected),
Att: 2 Exhibit D,
Att: 3 Exhibit D-1,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-2,
Att: 5 Exhibit D-3
32 32 oth_doc Reply Brief Mon 04/28 9:31 PM
REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay 18 by Attorney Matthew G. Munro on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Munro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Thu 04/10 4:04 PM
ORDER - Defendants' unopposed motions to extend are granted. (Filing No. 42 in Case No. 8:24-cv-499; Filing No. 30 in Case No. 8:25-cv-16). The reply brief as to the pending Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay, (Filing No. 32 in Case No. 8:24-cv-499, and Filing No. 18 in Case No. 8:25-cv- 16) is now due on April 28, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
30 30 motion Extend Wed 04/09 3:40 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend The Deadline for Defendants to File A Reply Brief In Support Of Their MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay 18 by Attorney Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Brookhouser, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/07 6:31 PM
MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA OR, ALERTNATIVELY, TO STAY regarding Brief,19 , MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay 18 by Attorney Joshua R. Jacobson on behalf of Plaintiff Djakarta A. Jacobs.(Jacobson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/02 7:17 PM
NOTICE of regarding Brief,,8 [Notice of Supplemental Authority] by Attorney Salvatore J. Graziano on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Edward Carr, Michael Davis, Mary Loughran, Terrance TJ McDonald, Rosemary Orlando, Donald Saunders(Graziano, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schwab Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Wells Fargo Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Wells Fargo Hearing Transcript
Monday, March 24, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 03/24 1:56 PM
ORDER - Plaintiffs' unopposed motions to extend are granted. (Filing No. 38 in Case No. 8:24-cv-499; Filing No. 26 in Case No. 8:25-cv-16). The response brief as to the pending Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay, (Filing No. 32 in Case No. 8:24-cv-499, and Filing No. 18 in Case No. 8:25-cv- 16) is now due on April 7, 2025. Any reply as to the motion to transfer shall be filed in accordance with the Local Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (MKR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Fri 03/21 2:38 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Joshua R. Jacobson on behalf of Plaintiff Djakarta A. Jacobs.(Jacobson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
25 25 oth_doc Reply Brief Fri 03/14 8:01 PM
REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer this Action to the Central District of California 7 by Attorney Salvatore J. Graziano on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Edward Carr, Michael Davis, Mary Loughran, Terrance TJ McDonald, Rosemary Orlando, Donald Saunders.(Graziano, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
24 24 order Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Thu 03/13 3:36 PM
TEXT ORDER regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice21 . Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, Donald Mixon on behalf of Attorney Joseph E. Floren, receipt number ANEDC-5275044. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 order Strike Order Tue 03/11 3:07 PM
TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice 22 is stricken for the following reason(s): Attorney is already admitted full-time. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/11 3:05 PM
*STRICKEN* TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice21 for attorney Joseph E. Floren. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO) Modified on 3/11/2025 to strike per strike order 23 (LKO)
Related: [-]
21 21 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/11 2:41 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Floren Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5275044 by Attorney Joseph E. Floren on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Floren, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
20 20 oth_doc Index Mon 03/10 10:00 PM
INDEX in support of MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay 18 by Attorney Matthew G. Munro on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Munro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-4,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-5,
Att: 7 Exhibit A-6,
Att: 8 Exhibit A-7,
Att: 9 Exhibit A-8,
Att: 10 Exhibit A-9,
Att: 11 Exhibit A-10,
Att: 12 Exhibit A-11,
Att: 13 Exhibit A-12,
Att: 14 Exhibit A-13,
Att: 15 Exhibit A-14,
Att: 16 Exhibit A-15,
Att: 17 Exhibit A-16,
Att: 18 Exhibit A-17,
Att: 19 Exhibit A-18,
Att: 20 Exhibit A-19,
Att: 21 Exhibit A-20,
Att: 22 Exhibit B,
Att: 23 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 24 Exhibit B-2,
Att: 25 Exhibit C,
Att: 26 Exhibit C-1,
Att: 27 Exhibit C-2,
Att: 28 Exhibit C-3,
Att: 29 Exhibit C-4,
Att: 30 Exhibit C-5,
Att: 31 Exhibit C-6
19 19 oth_doc Brief Mon 03/10 9:52 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay 18 by Attorney Matthew G. Munro on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Munro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/10 9:51 PM
MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Central District of California or, Alternatively, Stay by Attorney Matthew G. Munro on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Munro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 oth_doc Brief Fri 03/07 7:59 PM
BRIEF in opposition to TO MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TRANSFER ACTION TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Attorney Jacob L. Phillips on behalf of Plaintiff Djakarta A. Jacobs.(Phillips, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 8:18 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice15 for attorney Jason J. Mendro. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/05 4:21 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5271218 by Attorney Jason J. Mendro on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Mendro, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 02/28 11:49 AM
TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion to Extend TD Ameritrade Plaintiffs shall have until March 7, 2025 to respond to Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene and to Transfer this Action to the Central District of California. (Filing No.7 ). Any reply shall be filed in accordance with the local rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (CEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
13 13 motion Extend Thu 02/27 3:52 PM
MOTION to Extend Response to MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer this Action to the Central District of California 7 by Attorney Jacob L. Phillips on behalf of Plaintiff Djakarta A. Jacobs.(Phillips, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order For Extension of Time
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 02/25 1:21 PM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay. Defendants' deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading is stayed. The deadline will be reset, as appropriate, following rulings on the Motion to Consolidate and for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel (Filing No. 14 in 8:24-cv-499) and the Motions to Intervene and Transfer This Action to the Central District of California. (Filing No. 18 in 8:24-cv-499, and Filing No. 7 in 8:25-cv-16). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson. (CEW)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stay Tue 02/25 9:30 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Defendants' Deadline to File an Answer or Other Response to the Complaint by Attorney Matthew G. Munro on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Munro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 02/24 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Attorney Joshua R. Jacobson on behalf of Plaintiff Djakarta A. Jacobs (Jacobson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 oth_doc Index Sat 02/15 12:04 PM
INDEX in support of MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer this Action to the Central District of California 7 by Attorney Salvatore J. Graziano on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Edward Carr, Michael Davis, Mary Loughran, Terrance TJ McDonald, Rosemary Orlando, Donald Saunders.(Graziano, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Salvatore J. Graziano,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - News Article,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Schwab Website Page,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Merger Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - TD Ameritrade Client Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - TD Ameritrade Client Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - TD Ameritrade Disclosure Brochure,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - TD Ameritrade Client Agreement,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Redacted Account Statement,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Redacted Account Statement,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Redacted Account Statement,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Redacted Account Statement,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - News Article,
Att: 14 Exhibit M - News Article,
Att: 15 Exhibit N - News Article,
Att: 16 Exhibit O - Consolidation Order,
Att: 17 Exhibit P - Motion to Enforce Consolidation Order,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q - Saunders Complaint,
Att: 19 Exhibit R - Lourenco Order,
Att: 20 Exhibit S - Canales Order
8 8 oth_doc Brief Fri 02/14 11:56 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer this Action to the Central District of California 7 [Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene and to Transfer this Action to the Central District of California and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel] by Attorney Salvatore J. Graziano on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Edward Carr, Michael Davis, Mary Loughran, Terrance TJ McDonald, Rosemary Orlando, Donald Saunders.(Graziano, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Intervene Fri 02/14 11:53 PM
MOTION to Intervene and to Transfer this Action to the Central District of California by Attorney Salvatore J. Graziano on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Edward Carr, Michael Davis, Mary Loughran, Terrance TJ McDonald, Rosemary Orlando, Donald Saunders.(Graziano, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 11:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Salvatore J. Graziano on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Mary Loughran, Rosemary Orlando, Edward Carr, Donald Saunders, Michael Davis, Terrance TJ McDonald (Graziano, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 01/15 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. and TD Ameritrade, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Wed 01/15 3:36 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Requested Wed 01/15 3:36 PM
Summons Requested as to TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. regarding Complaint1 . (Jacobson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Requested Wed 01/15 3:35 PM
Summons Requested as to TD Ameritrade, Inc. regarding Complaint1 . (Jacobson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5234451), by Attorney Joshua R. Jacobson on behalf of Djakarta Jacobs(Jacobson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - Public (Related Case) Wed 01/15 3:37 PM
Remark - Public Related [+]: This notice serves to advise the parties that a plaintiff noted this case as related to another pending or closed case in this court. If a case is noted as related on the cover sheet or case opening screen when filed, the clerk assigns it to the district judge who handled the earlier pending or closed case. See NEGenR 1.4(a)(4)(B). Any challenge to operation of this rule must be made pursuant to NEGenR 1.4(a)(7). (LRM)
Related: [-] lated Case