New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:25-cv-00358
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
Ballon Stoll Bader and Nadler PC
Represented By
Jillian Tattersall
Ballon Stoll
contact info
Defendant
Attoreny Vano Haroutunian
Represented By
Jillian Tattersall
Ballon Stoll
contact info
Defendant
Attorney Vano Haroutunian
Represented By
Jillian Tattersall
Ballon Stoll
contact info
Defendant
Bil-lman Asset Management LLC
Represented By
Jillian Tattersall
Ballon Stoll
contact info
Plaintiff
Sehra Waheed
18 West 48th Street Apt. 3A
New York, NY 10036


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
58 58 misc Letter Thu 05/01 1:40 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Sehra Waheed dated 4/30/2025 re: Injunction against defendants. Document filed by Sehra Waheed.(ar)
Related: [-]
57 57 28 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Thu 05/01 1:32 PM
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUEST FOR AN EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 65(B) re:56 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Sehra Waheed. (ar)
Related: [-]
56 56 misc Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Thu 05/01 1:28 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by Sehra Waheed. (ar)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Thu 05/01 2:46 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. 56 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
55 55 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 5:41 PM
ORDER: On April 22, 2025, Judge Engelmayer referred this case to me for general pretrial management and all dispositive motions. (ECF 51). The Court notes that Plaintiff has proposed to consent to my jurisdiction for all purposes under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. (See ECF Nos. 10, 54). In the interests of efficiency and judicial economy, Defendants are directed to file a letter by May 9, 2025, indicating whether they would also consent to my jurisdiction for all purposes. The parties are reminded that there are no adverse substantive consequences to not consenting to my jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/29/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
54 54 misc Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 10:08 AM
PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sehra Waheed. Document filed by Sehra Waheed. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
53 53 motion Conference Thu 04/24 12:02 PM
LETTER MOTION REQUEST FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Sehra Waheed, Pro Se Plaintiff dated 4/23/2025. Document filed by Sehra Waheed.(tg)
Related: [-]
52 52 motion Court to Request Counsel Thu 04/24 11:57 AM
APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO REQUEST PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Sehra Waheed.(tg)
Related: [-]