Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Case #: 2:25-cv-14017
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:44 AM EST
Defendant
Florida Legal Collections, P.A.
Defendant
The Law Offices of Travis R. Walker, P.A.
Defendant
Travis R Walker
Plaintiff
Lindsey Newell
Represented By
Thomas Martin Bonan
Seraph Legal P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Mon 05/12 12:15 PM
ORDER STRIKING EXHIBIT granting in part and denying in part20 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court shall STRIKE Docket Entry 19, Exhibit 1. Defendants may refile the exhibit on or by May 14, 2025, ensuring that all information required to be kept confidential is redacted. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Fri 05/09 5:25 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying18 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default. The Motion is facially deficient for failure to confer as required by Local Rule 7.1(a)(2). Conferral is mandatory and failure to do so is grounds for denial. Defendants may only re-file this motion after making a meaningful effort to confer with opposing counsel. Any renewed motion must strictly comply with Local Rules. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/9/2025. (ime)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
20 20 motion Strike Wed 05/07 8:23 PM
MOTION to Strike19 First MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND Specifically to Strike the Unredacted Exhibit by Lindsey Newell. Responses due by 5/21/2025. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/07 7:12 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND by The Law Offices of Travis R. Walker, P.A., Florida Legal Collections, P.A., Travis R Walker. Responses due by 5/21/2025.(Walker, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
18 18 motion Set Aside Default Wed 05/07 7:08 PM
First MOTION to Set Aside Default Clerk's Entry of Default by The Law Offices of Travis R. Walker, P.A., Florida Legal Collections, P.A., Travis R Walker.(Walker, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Wed 05/07 3:09 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Law Offices of Travis R. Walker, P.A., Florida Legal Collections, P.A., Travis R Walker - Motions Terminated:16 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/7/2025. (pcs)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Wed 05/07 1:13 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Lindsey Newell. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/17 10:40 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 13 Motion for Leave to Serve through Alternative Means or for Additional Time. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 04/17 10:38 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re8 Response/Reply (Other). Two or More Document Events Filed as One ; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. See DE # 13 Motion for Leave to Serve through Alternative Means or for Additional Time. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/16 9:08 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Lindsey Newell. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/16 9:06 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Lindsey Newell. The Law Offices of Travis R. Walker, P.A. served on 4/15/2025, response/answer due 5/6/2025. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 04/15 5:43 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Lindsey Newell. Travis R Walker served on 4/14/2025, response/answer due 5/5/2025. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 04/15 5:40 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Lindsey Newell. Florida Legal Collections, P.A. served on 4/15/2025, response/answer due 5/6/2025. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 respm Response/Reply (Other) Wed 04/09 6:20 PM
RESPONSE to 4 Order,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, with motion for leave to serve via alternative means and for extension of time to effect service of process by Lindsey Newell. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Wed 04/09 6:17 PM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Lindsey Newell as to Travis R Walker. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Wed 04/09 6:16 PM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Lindsey Newell as to The Law Offices of Travis R. Walker, P.A.. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Wed 04/09 6:15 PM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Lindsey Newell as to Florida Legal Collections, P.A.. (Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Order to Show Cause Thu 04/03 3:05 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. The Complaint in this case was filed on January 15, 2025. (DE1 ). The record reflects that summonses were issued to the three defendants on January 16, 2025. (DE3 ). There has been no docket activity in this matter since then. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), a plaintiff has 90 days from the filing of a complaint to serve a defendant. In light of the foregoing, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a status report on or before April 9, 2025 setting forth what progress has been made with respect to service of process. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to comply with Rule 4(m) and/or failure to respond to court orders constitute grounds for dismissal. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/3/2025. (kid)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/16 9:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Florida Legal Collections, P.A., The Law Offices of Travis R. Walker, P.A., Travis R Walker. (cwc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/16/2025) (cwc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 01/16 9:36 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 9:35 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18122500, filed by Lindsey Newell.(Bonan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Summon(s)