District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Dabney L Friedrich
Case #: 1:25-cv-00117
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:30 AM EST
Amicus
BIOTECHNOLOGY INNOVATION ORGANIZATION
Represented By
Philip Jonathan Perry
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Amicus
PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND MANUFACTURERS OF AMERICA
Represented By
Philip Jonathan Perry
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By
John Bardo
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
CAROLE JOHNSON
Represented By
John Bardo
Doj-Usao
contact info
Movant
340B
Represented By
Margaret M. Dotzel
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
William Barnett Schultz
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Movant
GENESIS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By
Margaret M. Dotzel
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
William Barnett Schultz
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Movant
UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Margaret M. Dotzel
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
William Barnett Schultz
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION
Represented By
Jacob Tyler Young
contact info
Sean Marotta
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info

GPO May 15 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the plaintiff's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment; the government's 31 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; and the intervenors' 32 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 15, 2025. (lcdlf1)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
52 52 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 05/15 10:41 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re45 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, filed by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION.(Marotta, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
51 51 34 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 05/15 9:37 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the plaintiff's12 Motion for Summary Judgment; the government's31 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; and the intervenors'32 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 15, 2025. (lcdlf1)
Related: [-]
50 50 order .Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/15 9:36 PM
ORDER denying the plaintiff's12 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting the government's31 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part the intervenors'32 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 15, 2025. (lcdlf1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
49 49 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 10:24 PM
NOTICE to the Court by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION(Marotta, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, May 08, 2025
48 48 motion Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Thu 05/08 6:52 PM
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by 340B, GENESIS HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Schultz, William)
Related: [-]