Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew T Schelp
Case #: 4:25-cv-00065
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Terminated:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:29 AM CST
Defendant
City of New Haven
Plaintiff
Christopher S. Hammann
Represented By
Christopher S. Swiecicki
Swiecicki And Muskett LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 25 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Doc. 8, is GRANTED. A separate Order of Dismissal dismissing this action will be entered herewith. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on April 25, 2025. (BRP)

Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case) Fri 04/25 1:37 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered this same date, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on April 25, 2025. (BRP)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Memorandum & Order Fri 04/25 1:26 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Doc.8 , is GRANTED. A separate Order of Dismissal dismissing this action will be entered herewith. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on April 25, 2025. (BRP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/24 9:24 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant City of New Haven. (Bates, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
12 12 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/21 6:23 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Christopher S. Hammann. (Swiecicki, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/21 9:15 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Consent for Additional Time filed by Plaintiff Christopher S. Hammann. (Swiecicki, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Thu 04/17 8:17 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than Friday, April 18, 2025, Plaintiff Christopher Hammann shall show cause why the Court should not grant Defendant's unopposed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Doc.8 , or otherwise dismiss this action for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute it. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.01(B) (providing that each party opposing a motion must file opposition to the motion within fourteen days after service of the motion). (Show Cause Response due by 4/18/2025.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 4/17/2025. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 03/25 3:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant City of New Haven. (Bates, Rachel)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 03/25 3:25 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant City of New Haven.(Bates, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment EEOC Charge of Discrimination
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 03/24 10:40 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel A. Bates for Defendant City of New Haven. (Bates, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/21 3:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by City of New Haven.(Bates, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/22 3:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of New Haven City of New Haven waiver signed on 1/21/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Swiecicki, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Issued Thu 01/16 10:28 AM
WAIVER of Service issued defendantCity of New Haven. sent to City of New Haven on 1/16/2025 filed by Christopher S. Hammann. Waiver of Service due by 3/18/2025. (Swiecicki, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Thu 01/16 10:19 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Christopher S. Hammann. (Swiecicki, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (CSCI) Thu 01/16 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Original Filing Form not filed, Notice of Process Server not filed, Summons or Waiver not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Thu 01/16 12:01 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. 1 Waiver(s) of Service issued. (JBH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 5:39 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Christopher S. hammann with receipt number AMOEDC-11034674, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Christopher S. hammann.(Swiecicki, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet