Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-04242
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 12:27 AM MST
Defendant
Jacobo Santiago-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Leo Mitchell Masursky
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/16/2025 1:24 AM MST
Friday, January 10, 2025
Arrest of Jacobo Santiago-Lopez on 1/10/2025. (BHA)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jacobo Santiago-Lopez. (BHA)
Related: [-]