Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00004
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
William T Gebel (1)
Represented By
Richard W Monahan
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kyle J Healey
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/16/2025 2:59 AM EST
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to William T Gebel (1). (art) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
4 4 [FILED IN ERROR - REFILED AS DOC. 5] MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to William T Gebel. (Healey, Kyle) Modified Docket Text on 9/6/2024 (km). [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ
5 5 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to William T Gebel (Healey, Kyle) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William T Gebel. (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to William T Gebel. (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to William T Gebel held on 9/10/2024. Defendant present with counsel from the Office of the Federal Public Defender (AFPD Richard Monahan). Defendant informed of charges and potential penalties. Financial affidavit presented to the Court. The Court appoints the Federal Public Defender to represent the Defendant in this matter. Defendant informed of his rights and provided copy of charging document. The United States is informed of its requirements under Brady v. Maryland and Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f). The United States moves for pretrial detention. Detention Hearing set for 9/12/2024 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Related [+] (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, Session ID #2429
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by William T Gebel. (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for William T Gebel (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/10/2024. (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
10 10 Due Process Protections Act Order as to William T Gebel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/10/2024. (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to William T Gebel: Detention Hearing set for 9/12/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/10/2024. (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
12 12 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/10/2024 in case as to William T Gebel. (kev) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Detention Hearing held 9/12/2024 as to William T Gebel (1). Defendant present with appointed counsel AFPD Richard Monahan. Arguments heard. The Court orders Defendant detained pending trial in this matter. Defendant waives preliminary hearing and executes the necessary waiver. Case to proceed to the grand jury. Related [+] (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, Session ID #2431
14 14 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by William T Gebel. (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to William T Gebel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/12/2024. (km) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
16 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 12/9/2024. by USA as to William T Gebel. (Healey, Kyle) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Signed Waiver
17 17 ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to William T Gebel (1). Accordingly, the time period specified in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), within which the United States must file an indictment or information relative to the current charge(s) in this matter, is extended for an additional period of sixty (60) days, up to and including December 9, 2024. The time period from the date when an indictment or information must have been filed originally shall be excluded in computing the time within which an indictment or information relative to thecharges(s) in this matter must be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/9/2024. (art) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
18 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 2/7/2025. by USA as to William T Gebel. (Healey, Kyle) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
19 19 ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to William T Gebel (1). Accordingly, the time period specified in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), within which the United States must file an indictment relative to the current charges in this matter, is extended for a period of sixty (60) days from December 9, 2024. The time period from the date when an indictment or information must have been filed originally shall be excluded in computing the time within which an indictment relative to the charges in this matter must be filed.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/10/2024. (art) [1:24-mj-00677-KLL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
21 21 INFORMATION as to William T Gebel (1) count(s) 1. (km)
Related: [-]
22 22 PLEA AGREEMENT as to William T Gebel (Healey, Kyle)
Related: [-]