Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00163
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 1:25 AM CST
Defendant
Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo (1)
Represented By
Jason M. Staloski
Firth Bunn Kerr Neill
contact info
Defendant
Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez (2)
Represented By
Octavio Arturo Dominguez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA-El Paso
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/16/2025 2:07 AM CST
Friday, January 10, 2025
Arrest of Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo, Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez (bg2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton as to Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo, Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez. (bg2)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo. (bg2)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez. (bg2)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Jason M. Staloski. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Octavio Arturo Dominguez. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2)
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton: Initial Appearance as to Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo held on 1/14/2025 NO BOND SET (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter (Esperanza Gallegos) required as to Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo (Court Reporter ERO.) (bg2)
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton: Initial Appearance as to Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez held on 1/14/2025 NO BOND SET (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter (Esperanza Gallegos) required as to Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez (Court Reporter ERO.) (bg2)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo, (Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 1/17/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez, ( Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 1/17/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (bg2)
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Angel Gabriel Tovar-Carrillo (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (bg2)
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yuleisy Yusmey Vicente-Yepez (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (bg2)
Related: [-]