Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:24-cr-00329
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 16, 2025 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
Joseph Robinson (1)
Represented By
Katherian D Roe
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Ryan Patrick Garry
Ryan Garry, Attorney, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rebecca Kline
United States Attorney'S Office For The District Of Min
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/16/2025 2:00 AM CST
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT (Unsealed 12/19/2024) assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell referred to Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins by USA Rebecca Kline as to Joseph Robinson (1) count(s) 1-3, 4, 5-6. Forfeiture allegations as to this indictment. (MMG) Modified text on 12/19/2024 (LEG). DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 12/27/24. (kt)
Related: [-]
2 2 Defendant Information Sheet as to Joseph Robinson. (MMG) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 12/27/24. (kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Signature Page
3 3 Bench Warrant Issued as to Joseph Robinson by Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (MMG)
Related: [-]
4 4 Oral Motion to Seal pursuant to LR 49.1 the Indictment be sealed and remain sealed until the defendants have had their first appearance by USA as to Joseph Robinson. (MMG)
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral Order granting Motion to Seal pursuant to Rule 49.1(d) of the Local Rules for the District of Minnesota, the indictments proposed to be filed under seal be so filed and remain sealed until the defendant, as to Joseph Robinson (1), make his/her initial appearance before the court by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 12/17/24. (MMG)
Related: [-]