Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Chad F Kenney
Case #: 2:25-cv-00266
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:48 AM EST
Defendant
Kevin Minehan
2153 Carib Circle
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410
Represented By
DAVID S. MAKARA
Davis Bucco & Ardizzi
contact info
Defendant
CHRISTI INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff
ANDREW T. LUNNEY
Represented By
JAMES E. DELBELLO, JR.
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC G. MCDOWELL
Represented By
JAMES E. DELBELLO, JR.
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Unrepresented Party
CHRISTI INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By
JAMES E. DELBELLO, JR.
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Unrepresented Party
KEVIN MINEHAN
2153 CARIB CIRCLE
PALM BEACH GARDENS, FL 33410


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/06 2:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC G. MCDOWELL, ANDREW T. LUNNEY. CHRISTI INSURANCE GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 4/24/2025, answer due 6/23/2025. (DELBELLO, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 1:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHRISTI INSURANCE GROUP, INC., ANDREW T. LUNNEY, ERIC G. MCDOWELL.(DELBELLO, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
misc Remark Wed 04/30 7:44 AM
DOC. #11 MAILED TO UNREP. (tomg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 9:53 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTI INSURANCE GROUP, INC. ON OR BEFORE MAY 7, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/28/25. 4/29/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREP NOT MAILED. (va) Modified on 4/29/2025 (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss Thu 04/17 3:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEVIN MINEHAN.Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint.(MAKARA, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
9 9 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Wed 02/19 1:23 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by Kevin Minehan . (MAKARA, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 02/17 12:33 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CHRISTI INSURANCE GROUP, INC..(DELBELLO, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 4:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC G. MCDOWELL, ANDREW T. LUNNEY. Kevin Minehan waiver sent on 2/3/2025, answer due 4/4/2025. (DELBELLO, JAMES)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Tue 02/04 3:10 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by ERIC G. MCDOWELL . (DELBELLO, JAMES)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Tue 02/04 3:09 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by ANDREW T. LUNNEY . (DELBELLO, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
misc Remark Mon 01/27 3:32 PM
Copy of Order (Doc. No. 4) mailed to Unreps on 1/27/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/17 12:18 PM
ORDER THAT EACH PARTY TO THE ACTION IS REQUIRED TO FILE OF RECORD THEIR DISCLOSURE OF CITIZENSHIP IN DIVERSITY JURISDICTION CASES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/17/25. 1/17/25 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/17 12:11 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6), (e), OR (f), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/17/25. 1/17/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 01/16 2:02 PM
Summons Issued as to CHRISTI INSURANCE GROUP, INC., Kevin Minehan. Forwarded To: counsel on 1/16/25 (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 01/15 7:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Kevin Minehan ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18004973.), filed by Eric McDowell, Andrew Lunney.(DELBELLO, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Designation Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Shareholders Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Minehan Termination Email