Consolidated
Lead case: 1:24-cv-10049

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:25-cv-00449
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332lb Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Blake Lively
Represented By
Stephanie Anne Roeser
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Kristin Bender
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Esra A. Hudson
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Matthew F. Bruno
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Michael Gottlieb
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Reynolds
Represented By
Kristin Bender
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Matthew F. Bruno
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Michael Gottlieb
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Leslie Sloane
Represented By
Lindsey Ruff
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
Andrew Villacastin
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Sigrid S. McCawley
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vision PR, Inc.
Represented By
Lindsey Ruff
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
Andrew Villacastin
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Sigrid S. McCawley
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Katherine Case
Represented By
Maxwell Kevin Breed
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Briana Butler Koslow
Represented By
Maxwell Kevin Breed
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Abel
Represented By
Jason Sunshine
Liner Freedman Taitelman & Cooley LLP
contact info
Kevin A. Fritz
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Jason William Sunshine
Freedman Taitelman & Cooley, LLP
contact info
Amit Shertzer
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Schuster
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Baldoni
Represented By
Jason Sunshine
Liner Freedman Taitelman & Cooley LLP
contact info
Kevin A. Fritz
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Jason William Sunshine
Freedman Taitelman & Cooley, LLP
contact info
Amit Shertzer
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Schuster
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamey Heath
Represented By
Jason Sunshine
Liner Freedman Taitelman & Cooley LLP
contact info
Kevin A. Fritz
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Jason William Sunshine
Freedman Taitelman & Cooley, LLP
contact info
Amit Shertzer
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Schuster
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
It Ends With Us Movie LLC
Represented By
Jason Sunshine
Liner Freedman Taitelman & Cooley LLP
contact info
Kevin A. Fritz
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Jason William Sunshine
Freedman Taitelman & Cooley, LLP
contact info
Amit Shertzer
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Schuster
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Nathan
Represented By
Jason Sunshine
Liner Freedman Taitelman & Cooley LLP
contact info
Kevin A. Fritz
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Jason William Sunshine
Freedman Taitelman & Cooley, LLP
contact info
Amit Shertzer
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Schuster
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayfarer Studios LLC
Represented By
Jason Sunshine
Liner Freedman Taitelman & Cooley LLP
contact info
Kevin A. Fritz
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Jason William Sunshine
Freedman Taitelman & Cooley, LLP
contact info
Amit Shertzer
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Schuster
Meister Seelig & Fein PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
103 103 order Order on Motion to Strike Thu 05/15 1:42 PM
ORDER granting (218) Motion to Strike docket entry and document (102 in 1:25-cv-00449-LJL, 219 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL) Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Jennifer Abel, Melissa Nathan, Steve Sarowitz, Jamey Heath, Justin Baldoni, It Ends With Us Movie LLC, Wayfarer Studios LLC, (217 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 101 in 1:25-cv-00449-LJL) Letter, filed by Jennifer Abel, Melissa Nathan, Steve Sarowitz, Jamey Heath, Justin Baldoni, It Ends With Us Movie LLC, Wayfarer Studios LLC from the record. in case 1:24-cv-10049-LJL in case 1:25-cv-00449-LJL. The motion to strike is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike Dkt. No. 217 in 24-cv-10049 and Dkt. No. 101 in 25-cv-449. The Clerk of Court is additionally directed to strike Dkt. No. 219 in 24-cv-10049, including Dkt. No. 219-1, and Dkt. No. 102 in 25-cv-449, including Dkt. No. 102-1. Counsel is advised that future misuse of the Courts docket may be met with sanctions. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/15/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL (ks)
Related: [-]
102 102 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 12:13 PM
***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (102) from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to (220 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 103 in 1:25-cv-00449-LJL) Order on Motion to Strike, , , , . Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL (ks) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Bryan J. Freedman dated 5/15/2025 re: (218 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL) MOTION to Strike Document No. (217) Letter Response and Motion to Strike addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Esra A Hudson dated May 14, 2025 . . Document filed by Jennifer Abel, Justin Baldoni, Jamey Heath, It Ends With Us Movie LLC, Melissa Nathan, Steve Sarowitz, Wayfarer Studios LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Sunshine, Jason) Modified on 5/15/2025 (ks)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Ex. 1 - Affidavit of Bryan J. Freedman
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
101 101 misc Letter Wed 05/14 1:50 PM
***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (101) from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to (220 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 103 in 1:25-cv-00449-LJL) Order on Motion to Strike, , , , . Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL (ks) LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Bryan J. Freedman dated 5/14/2025 re: Venable Subpoena. Document filed by Jennifer Abel, Justin Baldoni, Jamey Heath, It Ends With Us Movie LLC, Melissa Nathan, Steve Sarowitz, Wayfarer Studios LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Sunshine, Jason) Modified on 5/15/2025 (ks).
Related: [-]
100 100 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 05/14 1:06 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (202) Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part (203) Motion to Compel in case 1:24-cv-10049-LJL. Livelys motion to compel is accordingly GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Wayfarer Parties shall produce the documents responsive to RFP 46 directed to Abel and Nathan, RFP 58 directed to Baldoni, Heath and Sarowitz, RFPs 49 and 50 directed to TAG, and RFPs 73 and 74 directed to Wayfarer and IEWU, except for tax returns, by no later than May 28, 2025. The request for tax returns and the motion to compel documents responsive to RFP 47 to Abel and Nathan and RFP 59 to Baldoni, Heath, and Sarowitz, is denied without prejudice. The Court awards costs to neither side. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. Nos. 202 and 203. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/14/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
99 99 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/13 8:55 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Bryan J. Freedman dated 5/13/2025 re: (200 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL) LETTER MOTION to Compel Wayfarer Studios LLC and Tera Hanks, Mitz Toskovic, Ahmed Musiol, Ashmi Elizabeth Dang, Shekinah Reese, Jariesse Blackmon, AJ Marbory, Dion Suleman, and Jennifer Benson to produce relevant, non-privileged material in res . Document filed by Wayfarer Studios LLC, Wayfarer Studios LLC, Mitz Toskovic, Tera Hanks, Ashmi Dang, Ahmed Musiol, Shekinah Reese, Jarriesse Blackmon, AJ Marbory, Dion Suleman, Jennifer Benson. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Sunshine, Jason)
Related: [-]
98 98 order Stipulation and Order Tue 05/13 9:34 AM
JOINT STIPULATION ON THE PROTOCOL FOR DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY-STORED INFORMATION AND HARD COPY DOCUMENTS: To facilitate the exchange of electronically-stored information, documents, and hard copy documents pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, Blake Lively and Ryan Reynolds (collectively, "Lively/Reynolds Parties"); Vision PR, Inc. and Leslie Sloane ("Vision PR/Sloane Parties"); Stephanie Jones and Jonesworks LLC ("Jones Parties"); and Wayfarer Studios LLC, Justin Baldoni, Jamey Heath, Steve Sarowitz, It Ends With Us Movie LLC, Melissa Nathan, The Agency Group PR LLC, and Jennifer Abel (the "Wayfarer Parties," and together with Lively/Reynolds Parties, Vision PR/Sloane Parties, and Jones Parties, the "Parties") in Lively v. Wayfarer Studios LLC et al., U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York (Case No. 1:24-cv-10049-LJL) and Wayfarer Studios LLC et al. v. Lively et al., U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York (Case No. 1:25-cv-00449-LJL), hereby stipulate to the following Protocol for Discovery of electronically-stored information, documents, and hardcopy documents ("ESI Protocol" or "Stipulation") in the above-captioned consolidated cases, as further set forth. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/13/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL. (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
97 97 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 05/12 11:56 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (210 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint seeking indemnification . . Document filed by Jonesworks LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Tahler, Kristin)
Related: [-]
96 96 4 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/12 11:37 PM
LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kristin Tahler dated May 12, 2025 re: (199 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL) LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kristin Tahler dated May 9, 2025. . Document filed by Jonesworks LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Tahler, Kristin)
Related: [-]
95 95 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/12 2:09 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Letter Reply addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kristin Tahler dated May 12, 2025. Document filed by Jonesworks LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Tahler, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
94 94 4 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/09 9:49 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mitchell Schuster dated May 9, 2025 re: (92 in 1:25-cv-00449-LJL, 198 in 1:24-cv-10049-LJL) LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kristin Tahler dated May 9, 2025. . Document filed by Jennifer Abel, Agency Group PR LLC, Justin Baldoni, Jamey Heath, It Ends With Us Movie LLC, Melissa Nathan, Steve Sarowitz, Wayfarer Studios LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Schuster, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit B - Notice of Discontinuance
93 93 3 pgs motion Discovery Fri 05/09 7:46 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kristin Tahler dated May 9, 2025. Document filed by Jonesworks LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Tahler, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit A - Edgeworth Subpoena,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B - 2025.03.13 K. Tahler Letter,
Att: 3 5 pgs Exhibit C - 2025.03.31 K. Tahler Letter
92 92 motion Discovery Fri 05/09 7:31 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kristin Tahler dated May 9, 2025. Document filed by Jonesworks LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-10049-LJL, 1:25-cv-00449-LJL.(Tahler, Kristin)
Related: [-]
91 91 order Memo Endorsement Fri 05/09 11:22 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:90 Letter filed by Brett D McDowell ENDORSEMENT: The Court may not consider letters or requests from persons who are not parties to the proceedings. The proper procedure for a person with an interest in the case who wishes to be heard and who qualifies for intervention is to file a motion for intervention. Pursuant to the consolidation order at Dkt. No. 49, any request related to this case should be filed in Case No. 24-cv-10049. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/9/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]