Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:23-bk-70113

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 7:25-ap-07001
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
David J. Beckman
Represented By
David J. Beckman
contact info
Defendant
The Liquidating Trust of Inmet Mining, LLC
Represented By
The Liquidating Trust of Inmet Mining, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Michael O'Hare
Bailey & Glasser
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
34 34 order Trial Tue 04/22 4:31 PM
Joint Scheduling Order: Trial set for 1/26/2026 at 9:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (awd)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Continue Trial(O) Tue 04/22 4:25 PM
Order GRANTING Joint Motion to Amend Amended Order for Trial Related [+] (awd)
Related: [-] 29
32 32 misc Proposed Order Submitted Tue 04/22 4:07 PM
Proposed Order submitted by James R. Irving on behalf of Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC, Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC, The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC Related [+]. (Irving, James)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Counter-Claimant Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC, Defendant Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC, Counter-Defendant Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC, Plaintiff Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC, Counter-Defendant The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC, Defendant The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC, Motion to Extend Time, 30 Deficiency re No Order Tendered
31 31 misc Proposed Order Submitted Tue 04/22 3:34 PM
Proposed Order submitted by James R. Irving on behalf of Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC, Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC, The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC Related [+]. (Irving, James)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Counter-Claimant Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC, Defendant Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC, Counter-Defendant Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC, Plaintiff Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC, Counter-Defendant The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC, Defendant The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC, Motion to Extend Time, 30 Deficiency re No Order Tendered
Thursday, April 17, 2025
30 30 epo Deficiency re No Order Tendered Thu 04/17 11:31 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the record and finding that no proposed order having been tendered with Joint Motion to Continue Trial and to Extend Deadlines [ECF No. 29 ] as required by KYEB LBR 9013-1(d), It is ORDERED that, within 3 working days from the entry of this Order, a proposed order shall be tendered. Failure to tender an order may result in the denial of the requested relief [ECF No. 29 ]. /s/ Judge Douglas L. Lutz Document Due: 4/22/2025 (srw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
29 29 motion Continue Trial Thu 04/17 11:27 AM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial and to Extend Deadlines, filed by Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC, Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC, and The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (srw)
Related: [-] 21 Order for Trial
28 28 motion Alter or Amend Wed 04/16 2:37 PM
DOCUMENT TERMINATED. Any responsive pleadings should be related to Corrected Entry [ECF No. 29 ]. Joint Motion to Amend Amended Order for Trial, filed by The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (Irving, James) Modified on 4/17/2025 (srw)
Related: [-] 21 Order for Trial
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 03/21 4:11 PM
Answer to Counterclaim re: Related [+] /Answer and Affirmative Defenses of the Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC to Counterclaim of the Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC Filed by The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC. (Irving, James)
Related: [-] latedDoc #16
Friday, March 14, 2025
26 26 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 03/14 12:23 PM
Answer to Counterclaim re: Related [+] Filed by Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC. (Johnson, Nicholas)
Related: [-] latedDoc #16
Thursday, March 06, 2025
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/06 4:10 PM
Certificate of Service, filed by Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC Related [+]. (O'Hare, Daniel)
Related: [-] 21 Order for Trial
Thursday, February 27, 2025
24 24 court Receipt Information from District Court Fri 02/28 8:48 AM
Receipt Information from District Court Related [+]. (awd)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion for Kyle F. Arendsen to Appear pro hac vice
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/27 3:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David K. Boydstun Jr Filed by on behalf of The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC. (Boydstun, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
22 22 notice Notice Tue 02/25 5:52 PM
Notice of CONSENT REGARDING BANKRUPTCY RULE 7012(b) Filed by Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC. (Czernin, F.)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Trial Tue 02/25 11:21 AM
Amended Order for Trial. Trial set for 7/29/2025 at 9:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (awd) Attorney for Plaintiff(s)
Related: [-]
20 20 epo File Statement re Consent Tue 02/25 11:16 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer (consent statement only mentioned counterclaim), [ECF No. 16 ], do(es) not contain such a statement, It is ORDERED that, within 7 days from the entry of this Order, F. Maximilian Czernin shall file a notice regarding consent in conformity with the above-mentioned rule(s). /s/ Judge Douglas L. Lutz Date due: 3/4/2025.(awd)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Reassignment/Recusal Tue 02/25 10:50 AM
Order of Reassignment. Involvement of Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Terminated. Judge Douglas L. Lutz added to case (awd)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Sat 02/22 10:43 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by The Liquidating Trust of INMET Mining, LLC Related [+]. (Irving, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC, Plaintiff Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC
Friday, February 21, 2025
18 18 order Appear pro hac vice(Order) Mon 02/24 9:17 AM
Order MOOTING Motion of Stephen D. Lerner to Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (awd)
Related: [-] 11
16 16 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Fri 02/21 4:42 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC against Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC Filed by Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC Related [+]. (Czernin, F.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC
15 15 order Appear pro hac vice(Order) Fri 02/21 3:34 PM
Order GRANTING Motion of Kyle F. Arendsen to Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Payment Due: 3/7/2025. (awd)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/20 3:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kyle F. Arendsen Filed by on behalf of Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC. (Arendsen, Kyle)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 02/20 3:17 PM
Motion for Kyle F. Arendsen to Appear pro hac vice, filed by F. Maximilian Czernin (Czernin, F.)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/20 3:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen D. Lerner Filed by on behalf of Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC. (Lerner, Stephen)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 02/20 3:13 PM
Motion for Stephen D. Lerner to Appear pro hac vice, filed by F. Maximilian Czernin (Czernin, F.)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/20 3:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by F. Maximilian Czernin Filed by on behalf of Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC. (Czernin, F.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
9 9 court Receipt Information from District Court Tue 02/11 10:59 AM
Receipt Information from District Court Related [+]. (awd)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion for Nicholas S. Johnson to Appear pro hac vice
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
8 8 order Appear pro hac vice(Order) Wed 02/05 7:17 AM
Order GRANTING Motion of Nicholas S. Johnson to Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Payment Due: 2/19/2025. (awd)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, February 03, 2025
7 7 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 02/03 4:20 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nicholas Johnson, filed by Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC (Johnson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
6 6 utility Certificate of Service Wed 01/29 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service , filed by Daniel Michael O'Hare Related [+]. (O'Hare, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Trial
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 01/28 1:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John A. Budig Filed by on behalf of Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC. (Budig, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 court Summons Service Executed Mon 01/27 3:36 PM
Summons Service Executed. (O'Hare, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
3 3 order Trial Thu 01/23 2:35 PM
Order for Trial. Trial set for 7/8/2025 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (tb) Attorney for Plaintiff(s)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Wed 01/22 3:22 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (tb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/15 2:03 PM
Adversary case 25-07001 Complaint, filed by Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC against David J. Beckman, The Liquidating Trust of Inmet Mining, LLC Fee Amount 350. (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (O'Hare, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E