New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Referred: Sarah L Cave
Case #: 1:25-cv-00468
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
Rubys Midtown, LLC
Plaintiff
Alfred Trippett
Represented By
Gabriel Levy
Gabriel A. Levy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/21 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Rubys Midtown, LLC. Document filed by Alfred Trippett. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
12 12 order Memo Endorsement 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 03/18 12:05 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:11 Notice of Settlement filed by Alfred Trippett. ENDORSEMENT: On or before May 9, 2025, the parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal for the attention of the Honorable Jeannette A. Vargas. All pending deadlines are CANCELLED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 3/18/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/17 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Alfred Trippett..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
10 10 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/24 5:00 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:9 Letter Extension to Initiate Default filed by Alfred Trippett. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request at ECF No. 9 is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to initiate default judgment proceedings if Defendant does not appear and respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED up to and including March 24, 2025. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 3/24/2025.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 2/24/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Mon 02/24 12:24 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Gabriel A. Levy dated 2/24/25 re: Extension to Initiate Default. Document filed by Alfred Trippett..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 02/18 11:40 AM
ORDER, The Court sua sponte extends Defendant's responsive pleading deadline up to and including February 21, 2025. If Defendant has not appeared and filed a response to the Complaint by February 21, 2025, on or before February 24, 2025, Plaintiff shall initiate default judgment proceedings. SO ORDERED. (Rubys Midtown, LLC answer due 2/21/2025.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 2/18/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/27 2:02 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Rubys Midtown, LLC served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025. Service was accepted by Emma Johnson, the manager. Document filed by Alfred Trippett..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/27 11:15 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 1/27/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/27 11:11 AM
ORDER Plaintiff alleges that Defendant's website is not accessible to blind and visually impaired customers and, thus, violates Title III of the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA), 42 U.S.C. §12181 et seq. By separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial Purposes, including settlement. To be clear,the referral does not encompass any dispositive motions, which will be handled by the undersigned in the normal course. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 1/27/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 11:32 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rubys Midtown, LLC. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 01/17 11:24 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 01/17 11:29 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 01/17 11:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/16 1:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rubys Midtown, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alfred Trippett..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/16 1:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/16 1:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Rubys Midtown, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30472446)Document filed by Alfred Trippett..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]